Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80763
Short Caption:PELKOLA VS. PELKOLA (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D488682Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/26/2021How Submitted:On Record And Briefs
Expedited

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/10/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/10/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-09466
03/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-09468
03/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-09470
03/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC)
04/13/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not paid the filing fee or otherwise responded to this court's notice. "This appeal is dismissed." (SC)20-13865
05/08/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 06/15/20 ORDER).20-17441
05/08/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 06/15/20 ORDER).
05/15/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Reopen Appeal and Allow for Payment of Fees and Filing of Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-18609
05/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-18679
05/18/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Motion to Reopen (SC).20-18903
05/19/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition To Appellant's Motion To Reopen Appeal And Allow For Payment Of Fees And Filing Of Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-19097
05/26/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 13, 2020. (SC) (RECALLED REMITTITUR PER 06/15/20 ORDER).20-17441
06/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Recalling Remittitur and Reinstating Appeal. Appellant filed a motion to reopen the appeal. The clerk is directed to recall the remittitur, and this appeal is reinstated. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee. Failure to timely pay the filing fee may result in dismissal of this appeal. No further action will be taken on this appeal until the filing fee is paid. (SC).20-22163
06/23/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from The Grimes Law Office. Check no. 2615. (SC)
06/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-23389
06/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellant to File Case Appeal Statement. Appellant's Case Appeal Statement due: 7 days. (SC).20-23612
06/26/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-23774
06/29/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. (SC).20-23921
07/09/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/18/19 To Court Reporter: Clerk of Family Court. (SC).20-25322
07/13/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-25691
07/21/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/18/19. (SC).20-26667
07/24/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/18/19. (SC)20-27087
08/10/2020Fast Track BriefFiled Appellants Fast Track Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 8/11/20). (SC)
08/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document - Fast Track Statement. (SC)20-29535
08/17/2020Fast Track BriefFiled Appellants Fast Track Statement. (SC)20-30232
08/17/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1 Part 1. (SC)20-30289
08/17/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2 Part 1. (SC)20-30290
08/17/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3 Part 1. (SC)20-30291
08/17/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4 Part 1. (SC)20-30295
09/08/2020MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Deadline to File the Respondent's Answering Brief (Fast Track Response). (SC)20-33097
09/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's fast track response due: September 22, 2020. (SC)20-33360
09/22/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for an Extension of Time (First Request). (SC)20-34956
09/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's fast track response due: October 1, 2020. (SC)20-35735
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1 of 2. (SC)20-36165
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 2 of 2. (SC)20-36166
10/01/2020Fast Track BriefFiled Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC)20-36190
11/04/2020Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. (SC)
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).21-08718
05/27/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 24. SNP21-RP/LS/AS. (SC).21-15219
06/11/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's petition for rehearing due: June 28, 2021. (SC)21-16913
06/28/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing En Banc. (SC)21-18612
07/06/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 5 days. (SC).21-19254
07/09/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Errata to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-19746
07/09/2021Filing FeeRehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Radford J. Smith, Chartered. Check no. 14348. (SC)
07/19/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)21-20734
08/02/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-22465