Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80774
Short Caption:STATE VS. FARMER, JR. (RIGDELL)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80696
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C344293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice HerndonPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/01/2021 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/01/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/11/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/11/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-09605
03/17/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-10470
03/25/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Nichols stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/29/19. (SC).20-11449
03/30/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Stacey Ray stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/12/19, and 2/20/20. (SC)20-12149
04/30/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-16371
04/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 1. (SC).20-16372
04/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 2. (SC).20-16374
04/30/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Video Recording. (SC).20-16382
05/13/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Stipulation for extension to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-18140
05/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief Due July 1, 2020. (SC)20-18182
05/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion to transmit a JAVS recording is granted. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court the JAVS recordings from the district court proceedings below in case number C-19-344293-1, from Department 11, on February 25, 2020. (SC)20-18220
05/13/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon M. Nichols stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/29/19. (SC)20-18238
06/29/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion For Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-24021
07/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until August 18, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-25225
08/17/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (SC)20-30264
08/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: September 17, 2020.20-30726
09/17/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-34248
09/17/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 1 (SC)20-34253
10/15/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-37874
10/15/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix to Reply Brief. (SC)20-37877
10/15/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
01/11/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. this matter is scheduled for oral argument on February 1, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-00767
01/20/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Disqualify Justice Douglas Herndon. (SC)21-01637
01/20/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-01652
01/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. The oral argument scheduled for February 1, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. has been rescheduled for February 1, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. (SC)21-01728
01/26/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Motion to Disqualify Justice Douglas Herndon. (SC)21-02396
01/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Recusal for Justice Herndon. (SC)21-02609
02/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Justice Herndon voluntarily recused himself from participation in this matter. Respondent's motion to disqualify Justice Herndon is denied as moot. (SC)21-02986
02/01/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 80774. (SC)
05/20/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn1[The Honorable Douglas Herndon, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in this matter.] EN BANC (SC)21-14602
06/14/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16935
06/14/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 15, 2021. (SC)21-16935