Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80814
Short Caption:MATA (MANUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C293322Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/17/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-10416
03/22/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC).20-11051
03/23/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC).20-11118
07/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC).20-25924
07/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 31, 2020. (SC)20-27310
08/31/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-32093
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-32094
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-32095
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)20-32096
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)20-32097
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)20-32098
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. (SC)20-32099
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. (SC)20-32100
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. (SC)20-32101
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9. (SC)20-32102
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10. (SC)20-32103
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 11. (SC)20-32104
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 12. (SC)20-32105
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 13. (SC)20-32106
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 14. (SC)20-32107
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 15. (SC)20-32108
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 16. (SC)20-32110
09/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Karen Mishler (SC)20-35817
09/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (SC)20-35818
10/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: November 2, 2020. (SC)20-36445
11/02/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (SC)20-39792
11/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: December 2, 2020. (SC)20-41123
12/01/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-43449
12/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Reply Brief. (SC)20-46881
01/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 16, 2021. (SC)21-00106
02/10/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
02/13/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-04379
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn3[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19791
07/26/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-21632
07/26/2021Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. (SC)
08/10/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). JH/RP/MG. (SC)21-23176
08/23/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-24403
08/31/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-25341
09/10/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-26234