Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 80814
Short Caption:MATA (MANUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C293322Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/17/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-10416
03/22/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC).20-11051
03/23/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC).20-11118
07/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC).20-25924
07/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 31, 2020. (SC)20-27310
08/31/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-32093
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-32094
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-32095
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)20-32096
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)20-32097
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)20-32098
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. (SC)20-32099
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. (SC)20-32100
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. (SC)20-32101
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9. (SC)20-32102
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 10. (SC)20-32103
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 11. (SC)20-32104
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 12. (SC)20-32105
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 13. (SC)20-32106
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 14. (SC)20-32107
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 15. (SC)20-32108
08/31/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 16. (SC)20-32110
09/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Karen Mishler (SC)20-35817
09/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (SC)20-35818
10/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: November 2, 2020. (SC)20-36445
11/02/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (SC)20-39792
11/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: December 2, 2020. (SC)20-41123
12/01/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-43449
12/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Reply Brief. (SC)20-46881
01/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 16, 2021. (SC)21-00106
02/10/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
02/13/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-04379
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn3[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19791
07/26/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-21632
07/26/2021Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. (SC)
08/10/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). JH/RP/MG. (SC)21-23176
08/23/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-24403
08/31/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-25341
09/10/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-26234
09/23/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [The Honorable Douglas W. Herndon, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. (SC)21-27533
10/18/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-29851
10/18/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).