Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80816
Short Caption:VENETIAN CASINO RESORT, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (SEKERA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79689, 79689-COA, 80450, 80816-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A772761Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/17/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Michael A. Royal. (SC)
03/17/2020Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Writ of Prohibition Under NRAP Rules 21(a)(6) and 27(e). (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10434
03/17/2020MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRAP 8 Staying Execution of Order Directing Petitioners to Disclose Private, Protected Information of Guests Not Involved in Underlying Lawsuit. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10435
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10440
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10441
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10443
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10444
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10445
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10447
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10448
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10449
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10450
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10451
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10453
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10454
03/17/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-10455
03/24/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Sean Claggett, William Sykes, Micah Echols, and Geordan Logan as Counsel for Real Party in Interest. (SC)20-11332
03/24/2020MotionFiled Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e). (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-11334
03/25/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply to Joyce Sekera's Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Under NRAP 27(e). (SC). (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 03/26/20 NOTICE).20-11481
03/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals, (SC).20-11589
03/26/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
06/19/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate the order compelling discovery and conduct proceedings consistent with this order." fn1 [The Honorable Bonnie A. Bulla, Judge, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT
06/24/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real Party in Interest's Petition for Review due: July 21, 2020. (SC)20-23393