Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0554
Short Caption:IN THE MATTER OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS RELATED TO THE CORONAVIRUS EMERGENCYCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Pending
Filed Date:03/19/2020Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/19/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order Concerning Access to Appellate Court Facilities filed in AO 0008 on March 13, 2020.20-10759
03/19/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order Concerning Access to Las Vegas Justice Court and Municipal Court Facilities at the Regional Justice Center filed in AO 0009 on March 18, 2020.20-10761
03/19/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order In Re COVID-19 Emergency Cancellation of Oral Argument and Public Hearing filed in AO 0010 on March 18, 2020.20-10763
03/19/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order Temporarily Closing the Supreme Court Law Library to the Public filed in AO 0011 on March 18, 2020.20-10765
03/20/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding temporary procedures in criminal cases filed in the Justice Court, Las Vegas Township on March 19, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-05).20-10898
03/20/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Administrative order regarding court operations under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19 and related coronavirus filed in the First Judicial District Court on March 16, 2020.20-10966
03/20/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations of criminal matters in response to COVID-19 filed in the Eighth Judicial District Court on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order #20-06).20-10968
03/20/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the Henderson Municipal Court's procedures regarding the Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Municipal Court of the City of Henderson on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-02).20-10971
03/20/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding emergency, interim or temporary orders during the time period covered by Administrative Order 2020-02 filed in the Second Judicial District Court on March 16, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-03).20-10973
03/20/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the Ninth Judicial District Court, East Fork Justice Court, Tahoe Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Ninth Judicial District Court, East Fork Justice Court, Tahoe Justice Court. (Administrative Order 20-01).20-10977
03/20/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding alternate dispute resolution, mediation, and short trial programs for the Eighth Judicial District Court filed in the Eighth Judicial District Court on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-05).20-10979
03/20/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding Boulder Township Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the Boulder Township, Justice Court on March 17, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-01).20-10981
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Administrative Matter of: The Second Judicial District Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Administrative Order 2020-2.20-11260
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Matter of: The Third Judicial District Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Administrative Order 20-01.20-11261
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Matter of: The Fourth Judicial District Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Administrative Order: 1.20-11262
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Matter of: The Fifth Judicial District Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Administrative Order.20-11263
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Matter of: The Sixth Judicial District Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19).20-11264
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Matter of: The Seventh Judicial District Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19).20-11265
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Matter of: The Eighth Judicial District Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Administrative Order: 20-01.20-11266
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled In the Administrative Matter of Temporarily Closing the Traffic Counter at the Regional Justice Center, Administrative Order: 0009; Administrative Order: 20-04. Order Concerning Access to Las Vegas Justice Court and Municipal Court Facilities at the Regional Justice Center.20-11269
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Matter of: The Tenth Judicial District Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Administrative Order: 20-001.20-11270
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Matter of: The Eleventh Judicial District Court's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) - Administrative Order: 2020-01.20-11271
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada: In the Administrative Matter of: Temporary Procedures for Criminal, Civil and Traffic Cases. Administrative Order: #2020-02.20-11272
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Justice Court, Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada: In the Administrative Matter Regarding Temporary Procedures in Criminal, Civil and Traffic Cases. Amended Administrative Order: #20-03.20-11273
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. In the Municipal Court of the City of Las Vegas, County of Clark, State of Nevada: Judicial/Administrative Order: Ref: JO-2.48, Effective Date: March 16, 2020. Supersede/Rescind No; Cross-Reference JO-None.20-11275
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada: In the Administrative Matter Regarding Unlawful Detainer Cases, Including the Supplemental Remedy of Summary Evisiton. Administrative Order: #20-06.20-11276
03/26/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark, Nevada. In the Administrative Matter of Court Operations of Civil Domestic Matters in Response to COVID-19. Administrative Order: 20-11.20-11550
03/26/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Justice Court, North Las Vegas Township, Clark County, Nevada. In the Administrative Matter Regarding Unlawful Detainer Cases Including the Supplemental Remedy of Summary Eviction. Administrative Order: #2020-03.20-11553