Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80832
Short Caption:THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS. SFR INVS. POOL 1, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A686522Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/24/2020 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/19/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26001701. (SC)
03/19/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-10813
03/19/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-10815
03/24/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC)20-11338
04/08/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: April 23, 2020. (SC).20-13400
04/21/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference has not been conducted as this matter is in a global settlement. Settlement Judge will schedule a status check in 60 days. (SC)20-15128
04/23/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-15580
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Melanie D. Morgan for Appellant. (SC)20-24088
07/14/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Because of Covid, this case is part of a global proposed settlement. Status update to occur in 45 days. (SC)20-25896
08/26/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. This is a global federal (9th circuit) attempt to settle. Counsel has indicated that they will need an extension up to the end of the year to resolve this matter if the court will so allow. (SC)20-31527
09/03/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to December 31, 2020. (SC)20-32618
12/17/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Other. The Settlement Judge reports that this matter should be removed from the Settlement Program. (SC)20-45718
12/22/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)20-46217
01/07/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: January 19, 2021. (SC)21-00371
01/07/2021MotionFiled Joint Motion for Stay of Briefing. (SC)21-00474
01/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties have filed a joint motion to suspend the briefing schedule and the deadline for filing a transcript request form pending a global settlement agreement. The motion is granted as follows. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form or certificate that no transcripts are requested, NRAP 9, and until April 21, 2021, to file and serve a motion or stipulation to dismiss the appeal or the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-01376
02/05/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/18/19. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC)21-03650
04/21/2021MotionFiled Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines to Complete Settlement. (SC)21-11495
04/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 21, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix or a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal. (SC)21-12467
05/14/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-13994
05/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Disapproving Stipulation. The parties have filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal. The stipulation is disapproved because it is not signed by counsel of record for respondent. Appellant shall have until May 21, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix, or a stipulation to dismiss this appeal signed by counsel of record for both parties, or a motion to dismiss this appeal. (SC)21-14281
05/18/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-14298
05/19/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)21-14354