Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80834
Short Caption:BURNS (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64809, 68497, 69959, 77424
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C267882Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Chief Justice Hardesty for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/14/2021 at 1:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/14/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/19/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/19/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-10847
03/23/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC).20-11071
03/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC).
03/31/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC).20-12327
07/14/2020MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC)20-25818
07/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Motion Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 17, 2020. (SC)20-25838
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC)20-29768
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC)20-29769
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3. (SC)20-29779
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4. (SC)20-29770
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5. (SC)20-29771
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6. (SC)20-29772
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7. (SC)20-29773
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8. (SC)20-29774
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9. (SC)20-29782
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 10. (SC)20-29775
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 11. (SC)20-29776
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 12. (SC)20-29777
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 13. (SC)20-29783
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 14. (SC)20-29778
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 15. (SC)20-29780
08/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 16. (SC)20-29781
08/12/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-29788
08/12/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to transmit presentence investigation report. (SC)20-29789
08/12/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to file appendix volume under seal. (SC)20-29790
08/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Presentence Investigation Report and Granting Motion to Seal Appendix. Presentence Investigation Report due: 14 day. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the appendix received on August 17, 2020. (SC)20-30722
08/20/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Sealed Appendix Pages 0001-0154. (SC)
08/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report. (Sealed) (SC)
09/11/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief (SC)20-33441
09/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved, Answering Brief due 10/12/2020 (SC)20-33445
10/12/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-37385
10/12/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)20-37386
10/27/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-39328
10/27/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. this matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 14, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-06430
03/31/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-09274
04/14/2021OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms
04/14/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. 80834. (NNP21-RP/LS/AS) (SC)
04/15/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC)21-10967