Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80837
Short Caption:HARVEST MGMT. SUB LLC VS. DIST. CT. (MORGAN) C/W 81975Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:80837*, 81975Related Case(s):77753, 78596, 81975
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A718679Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/14/2021 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/14/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/23/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Dennis L. Kennedy. (SC)
03/23/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (SC)20-11085
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)20-11105
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)20-11087
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)20-11106
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)20-11088
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)20-11092
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC)20-11095
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (SC)20-11096
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (SC)20-11097
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (SC)20-11098
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (SC)20-11099
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (SC)20-11100
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (SC)20-11101
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13. (SC)20-11102
03/23/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 14. (SC)20-11104
04/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Parties in Interests' Answer to the Petition for Writ due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC).20-12617
04/10/2020MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. (SC).20-13678
04/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove attorney Kathleen A. Wilde and Marquis Aurbach Coffing as counsel of record for Mr. Morgan. Mr. Morgan remains represented by Micah S. Echols, Bryan A. Boyack, and Benjamin P. Cloward. (SC)20-14300
04/30/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest, Aaron M. Morgan's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (First Request). (SC)20-16429
05/01/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Notice of Non-Opposition. (SC)20-16603
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Mr. Morgan shall have until June 1, 2020, to file and serve an answer to the petition for a writ of prohibition or mandamus. (SC).20-17526
06/01/2020MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (Second Request). (SC).20-20580
06/02/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Notice of Non-Opposition. (SC)20-20651
06/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ due: July 1, 2020. (SC).20-22162
07/01/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest, Aaron M. Morgan's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (Third Request). (SC)20-24488
07/02/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice of Non-Opposition. (SC)20-24586
07/15/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest, Aaron M. Morgan's Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to File Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (Third Request). (SC).20-26009
07/21/2020Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Aaron M. Morgan's Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief and Cross-Petition for Writ or Mandamus or Prohibition. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 8/13/20). (SC).20-26533
07/28/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief and Answer to Cross-Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)20-27407
08/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motions of real party in interest Aaron M. Morgan for third and fourth extensions of time, until July 20, 2020, to file an answer to the petition for a writ of prohibition or mandamus are granted. The answer was filed on July 21, 2020. The clerk shall strike the combined answer and cross-petition filed on July 21, 2020. Morgan shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended answer that complies with the page or type-volume limitations of NRAP 21(d). The answer shall also include a certificate of compliance that comports with NRAP 32(a)(9). Given this order, no action will be taken on the July 28, 2020, stipulation for an extension of time to file a reply. (SC)20-29923
08/20/2020MotionFiled Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Real Party in Interest Aaron M. Morgan's Amended Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (SC).20-30788
08/20/2020Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest Aaron M. Morgan's Amended Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (SC).20-30789
08/21/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (SC)20-30947
08/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Regarding Answer. Real party in interest Aaron Morgan's motion for leave to file an answer in excess of the page and type-volume limitations is granted. The answer of real party in interest David E. Lujan is overdue. Lujan shall have 14 days from the date of this order to either (1) inform this court in writing, that he will not be filing an answer or (2) file and serve his answer. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply to the answer or answers. The stipulation of petitioner and Morgan for an extension of time to file the reply is disapproved as moot. (SC)20-31327
09/24/2020BriefFiled Petitioner's Reply In Support of Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (SC)20-35226
01/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on February 11, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC).21-00299
01/07/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Dennis L. Kennedy of Bailey Kennedy will appear by video conference on behalf of Petitioner Harvest Management Sub LLC). (SC)21-00422
01/07/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest, Aaron M. Morgan's Motion to Continue Oral Argument Hearing and Clarify Scope of Argument. (SC)21-00476
01/11/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Rescheduling Oral Argument. The oral argument scheduled for February 11, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. The clerk of this court shall reschedule this matter for oral argument on April 14, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The scope of the argument shall be limited to the briefing filed in Docket No. 80837.21-00726
01/13/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Micah S. Echols, Esq., of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm will appear by video conference on behalf of Real Party in Interest Aaron M. Morgan at the oral argument). (SC)21-01143
01/13/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Dennis L. Kennedy of Bailey Kennedy will appear by video conference on behalf of petitioner Harvest Management Sub LLC at the oral argument). (SC)21-01159
03/31/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-09272
04/14/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. 80837. (NNP21-RP/LS/AS) (SC)
04/16/2021MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Consolidate. (Case No. 80837 and 81975) (SC)21-11145
05/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Consolidate. Nos. 80837/81975. (SC)21-13718
09/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petitions DENIED." Herndon, J., with whom HARDESTY, C.J., joins, dissenting - EN BANC. Nos. 80837/81975. (SC)21-26602