Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80840
Short Caption:ALECK VS. ZB NAT'L ASS'NCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1801188Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/27/2020 / Chubb, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/23/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kent Law P.L.L.C. Check no. 6082. (SC)
03/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-11168
03/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-11170
03/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-11172
03/27/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet L. Chubb. (SC)20-11775
04/06/2020MotionFiled Stipulation Requesting Parties Be Allowed to Have Private Mediation in Lieu of Court's Settlement Program. (SC)20-12866
04/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellant to file the Case Appeal Statement: due 7 days. (SC).20-12984
04/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Stipulation Requesting Parties Be Allowed to Have Private Mediation in Lieu of Court's Settlement Program). (SC).20-12986
04/06/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-12988
04/07/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC).20-13055
04/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service Of Stipulation Requesting Parties be Allowed to Have a Private Mediation. (SC)20-13167
04/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC)20-15023
05/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Status Report due: 60 days. (SC).20-17105
05/06/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Supreme Court has approved the parties' stipulation to have Judge Berry be the mediator. (SC)20-17191
05/29/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Supreme Court has approved the parties stipulation to have Judge Berry be the mediator. (SC)20-20300
07/02/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Status Report Re: Private Mediation. (SC)20-24611
07/09/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Amended Status Report Re: Private Mediation. (SC)20-25393
07/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 9, 2020, appellant filed an amended status report re: private mediation, informing this court that the private mediation had been re-set for July 21, 2020, and that a status report would be filed after the conclusion of the mediation. The status report is construed as a motion to extend time to file the status report, and the motion is granted. Appellant shall file a status report informing this court of the outcome of the mediation on or before July 24, 2020. This matter shall remain stayed pending further order of this court. (SC).20-26954
07/24/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Status Report Re: Private Mediation Unsuccessful. (SC)20-27017
07/27/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. On July 24, 2020, counsel for appellant filed a status report indicating the parties completed their mediation with the Honorable Janet Berry, Retired, but were unable to reach a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-27279
08/06/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC).20-28939
10/23/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-38870
10/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-38881
10/23/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-38882
11/17/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 7, 2020. (SC)20-41788
12/07/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-44469
01/06/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-00332
01/07/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/15/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "We therefore REVERSE and REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-10924
05/10/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13274
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13274