Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80847
Short Caption:PYRAMID TRIBE TR. VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1402037Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/27/2020 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/25/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices Jack I. McAuliffe, Chtd. Check no. 11092. (SC)
03/25/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-11498
03/25/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-11501
03/27/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (SC)20-11754
04/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Holly Walker and Darren Brenner as counsel for Respondent). (SC).20-12941
04/14/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-14119
04/20/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement). (SC).20-14962
04/27/2020Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Renovista Ridge Master Property Owners' Association. (SC)20-15957
04/29/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. Per the Settlement Judge, the decision whether to move forward with a settlement conference is still under consideration. (SC)20-16257
05/04/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation filed on April 27, 2020, this appeal is dismissed as to respondent Renovista Ridge Master Property Owners' Association only. NRAP 42(b). The caption shall be modified accordingly. (SC).20-16772
06/29/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference has not been conducted because whether or not to proceed with a settlement conference in this appeal is still under consideration. (SC).20-24077
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Melanie D. Morgan of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for respondent Bank of America). (SC)20-24135
10/21/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Settlement Judge requests 90 days to execute a formal agreement and fulfill its terms. (SC).20-38596
11/09/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Stipulation/Motion to Dismiss. Stipulation or Motion to Dismiss Due: 90 days. (SC)20-40888
02/01/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Donna M. Wittig of the law firm of Akerman LLP, as counsel for respondent Bank of America, N.A., Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP). (SC)21-02961
02/02/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Holly E. Walker is no longer associated with the law firm of Akerman LLP and requests that Ms. Walker be removed from the service list). (SC)21-03167
02/09/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. (SC)21-03824
02/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Joinder to Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. (SC)21-04358
02/24/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall file a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal within 30 days from the date of this order. (SC)21-05419
04/28/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-12228
05/06/2021Transcript RequestFiled Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)21-13086
05/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days of service of appellant's response. Briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC)21-13149
06/07/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)21-16234
06/10/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Cause appearing, the stipulation is approved and this appeal is dismissed. NRAP 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC).21-16713