Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80816-COA
Short Caption:VENETIAN CASINO RESORT, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (SEKERA)Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):79689, 79689-COA, 80450, 80816
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A772761Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:BullaCase Status:Writ Issued
Replacement:Senior Justice None for Judge BullaPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/26/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/26/2020Petition/WritFiled Petitioners' Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Writ of Prohibition Under NRAP Rules 21(a)(6) and 27(e). (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11598
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11600
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2 (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11601
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11602
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4 (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11603
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11605
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11607
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11608
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11609
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11611
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11613
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11615
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12 (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11617
03/26/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13 (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11618
03/26/2020MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRAP 8 Staying Execution of Order Directing Petitioners to Disclose Private, Protected Information of Guests Not Involved in Underlying Lawsuit. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11619
03/26/2020MotionFiled Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e). (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11621
03/26/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply to Joyce Sekera's Opposition to Petitioners' Emergency Under NRAP 27(e). (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 03/26/20 NOTICE). (COA).20-11622
03/27/2020OtherJudge Bonnie A. Bulla disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
03/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Stay. Having reviewed the petition and supporting documents, we conclude that an answer may assist this court in resolving the petition. Therefore, real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 14 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. NRAP 21(b)(1). Petitioners shall have 7 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. Having considered the parties' arguments for and against the stay under these factors, we conclude that a stay is warranted pending our consideration of this writ petition. Accordingly, we grant petitioners' motion and stay the March 13 district court order, pending further order of this court. (COA).20-11769
04/08/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real Party in Interest's Answer to the Petition for Writ due: April 24, 2020. (SC).20-13406
04/24/2020Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)20-15777
04/24/2020Petition/WritFiled DUPLICATE Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SC)20-15778
04/29/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Writ Petition due: May 15, 2020. (SC)20-16147
05/15/2020BriefFiled Petitioners' Reply Brief. (COA)20-18567
05/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief Vol 14. (COA)20-18568
05/15/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief Vol 15. (COA)20-18569
05/22/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Hold Decision in Abeyance. (COA)20-19522
06/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real party in interest's unopposed motion to hold a decision in this matter in abeyance pending final resolution of a related matter pending before this court, Docket No. 79689-COA, is granted to the following extent. No disposition in this matter will be made until the petition for rehearing in the related matter is decided by this court. (COA)20-21474
06/19/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate the order compelling discovery and conduct proceedings consistent with this order." fn1 [The Honorable Bonnie A. Bulla, Judge, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT20-22941
06/19/2020WritFiled Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the Order mailed to Attorney Michael Royal for service upon Judge Kathleen E. Delaney. (COA).20-22947