Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80855
Short Caption:BELLA VISTA RANCH CO., LLC VS. THE REG'L TRANSP. COMM'N OF WASHOE CTY.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1501717Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/30/2020 / Leonard, DebbieSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/26/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Stephen C. Mollath P.C. Check no. 6219. (SC)
03/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-11862
03/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-11866
03/30/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Debbie Leonard. (SC)20-12108
04/01/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-12447
04/09/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 11, 2020, at 9:00 AM. (SC)20-13601
05/08/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Amended ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 3, 2020, at 9:00 AM. (SC)20-17566
06/04/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-21112
06/12/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-21988
06/16/2020Transcript RequestFiled Notice that Transcripts are Filed in the District Court (Certificate of No Transcript Request). (SC)20-22454
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix and Index - BVR and RTC. (SC)20-28761
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-28768
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-28769
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3. (SC)20-28773
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4. (SC)20-28780
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5. (SC)20-28782
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6. (SC)20-28784
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 7. (SC)20-28787
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 8. (SC)20-28791
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 9. (SC)20-28793
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 10. (SC)20-28794
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 11. (SC)20-28796
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 12. (SC)20-28797
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 13. (SC)20-28798
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 14. (SC)20-28799
08/05/2020AppendixFiled Appendix and Index BVR. (SC)20-28800
08/12/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)20-29694
08/31/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Permission to File Joint Appendix Media Files on CD. (SC)20-31962
09/01/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule (First Request). (SC)20-32313
09/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 12, 2020. (SC)20-32353
09/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the joint appendix received on August 31, 2020. (SC)20-32551
10/12/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-37424
10/13/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. (SC)20-37504
10/13/2020AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix - Vol. I of I. (SC)20-37507
11/02/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)20-39818
11/02/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
02/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-05681
04/29/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-12370
05/12/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition For Rehearing. (SC)21-13627
05/12/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Stephen C. Mollath. (SC)
05/26/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)21-15075
06/21/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17693
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 24, 2021. (SC)21-17693