Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80857
Short Caption:LEVERTY & ASSOCS. LAW, CHTD. VS. EXLEYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80844
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 2019-CV-00299Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/26/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Leverty and Associates. Check no. 019447. (SC)
03/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-11891
03/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-11893
03/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-11896
04/01/2020MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Respondents. (SC)20-12437
04/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Appellant to file Case Appeal Statement and Docketing Statement. Appellant's case appeal statement and docketing statement due: 7 days. (SC).20-16463
05/05/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion, Exempting from Settlement Program, and Reinstating Briefing. The clerk shall remove attorneys Todd R. Alexander, Esq., and Sarah M. Molleck, Esq., of the law firm of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg, from the docket of this appeal. They are directed to serve a copy of this order on each respondent and to provide proof of service within 10 days of the date of this order. Respondent's Notice of Appearance of Counsel due: 30 days. Appellant(s): Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC)20-17035
05/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement (REJECTED PER 05/06/20 NOTICE). (SC).
05/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Case Appeal Statement). (SC).20-17206
05/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Termination of Counsel for Appellant. (SC)20-17370
05/08/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Vernon Leverty, Patrick Leverty, William Ginn, and Jess Rinehart for Appellant. (SC)20-17472
05/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-17473
05/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Amended Case Appeal Statement due: 7 days. (SC).20-18037
05/12/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)20-18082
05/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Affidavit of Service Re: Order Granting Motion. (SC)20-18137
05/19/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-18966
06/25/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Kirk N. Walker of Nevada Walker, PLLC as counsel for respondent Ray Warren Exley). (SC)20-23710
06/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel has since filed a notice of appearance on behalf of respondent Ray Warren Exley. To date, however, no counsel has filed a notice of appearance on behalf of the remaining respondents. Accordingly, this appeal shall proceed with the remaining respondents in pro se. The remaining respondents will not be permitted to file documents in this matter. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: 7 days. (SC).20-24028
06/29/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Refile of Docketing Statement filed May 8, 2020. (SC)20-24065
07/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC)20-26925
07/31/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 17, 2020. (SC)20-27991
08/17/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-30292
08/17/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC)20-30315
08/17/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC)20-30316
09/14/2020BriefFiled Respondent Ray Warren Exley's Answering Brief. (SC)20-33797
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Vol. I. (SC)20-33800
09/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.20-33830
09/15/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Ray Warren Exley's NRAP 26.1 Disclosure (Answering Brief). (SC)20-33913
10/05/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Suggestion of Death. (SC)20-36473
10/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a suggestion of death of respondent Ray Warren Exley. Counsel for Ray Warren Exley shall have 21 days from the date of this order to: (1) file a motion for substitution of the personal representative of Ray Warren Exley as a respondent in this appeal; (2) inform this court whether additional time is required for the substitution of a personal representative; or (3) inform this court that Ray Warren Exley has no personal representative. (SC)20-37227
10/15/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: October 28, 2020. (SC)20-37865
10/22/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Substitution (Ray Exley). (SC)20-38722
10/28/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-39543
10/29/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
10/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Motion for Substitution. (SC)20-39603
11/04/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Ray Warren Exley's reply due: November 19, 2020. (SC)20-40203
11/13/2020MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion for Substitution. (SC)20-41608
12/11/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall substitute "Juliana Loza Exley, Special Administrator of the Estate of Ray Warren Exley" in place of respondent Ray Warren Exley, an individual and judgment debtor, also known as Ray Warren Exley, M.D., on this court's docket, and shall amend the caption accordingly. (SC)20-45006
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-08671
06/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16517
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19188
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 7, 2021. (SC)21-19188