Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80876
Short Caption:STEFONICH VS. BAUTISTACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76079, 76079-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A684511Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/03/2020 / Haire, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/26/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/30/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/30/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-12082
03/30/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-12084
04/02/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith. Check no. 14598. (SC)
04/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-12551
04/03/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul M. Haire. (SC)20-12712
04/23/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-15383
04/27/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 18, 2020, at 9:30 AM.20-15832
05/28/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-20144
06/02/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-20684
06/16/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellants' Certificate of no Transcript Request. (SC)20-22428
08/19/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 14, 2020. (SC).20-30529
09/11/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (SC)20-33594
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1 (SC)20-33767
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2 (SC)20-33768
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3 (SC)20-33769
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4 (SC)20-33770
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5 (SC)20-33771
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6 (SC)20-33774
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7 (SC)20-33773
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8 (SC)20-33775
09/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9 (SC)20-33772
09/28/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' answering brief due: October 26, 2020. (SC)20-35487
10/14/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)20-37797
11/13/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)20-41485
11/13/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/16/2020OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
03/26/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-08675
05/27/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-15260
06/21/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-17695
06/21/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/02/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 22, 2021. (SC)21-17695