Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80884
Short Caption:FRANCHISE TAX BD. VS. HYATTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35549, 36390, 39274, 39312, 47141, 53264
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382999Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/19/2021How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/31/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/31/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC)
03/31/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-12316
03/31/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Pat Lundvall. (SC)
04/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-12387
04/02/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-12601
04/15/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC)20-14325
04/22/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-15292
07/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SEALED) (SC)
07/31/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER 7/31/20 NOTICE). (SC)20-27963
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC)20-27964
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC)20-27965
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC)20-27968
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC)20-27970
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC)20-27971
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. (SC)20-27972
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7. (SC)20-27973
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8. (SC)20-27976
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9. (SC)20-27980
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10. (SC)20-27981
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11. (SC)20-27982
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 12. (SC)20-27983
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13. (SC)20-27984
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 14. (SC)20-27985
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 15. (SC)20-27987
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 16. (SC)20-27988
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 17. (SC)20-27989
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 18. (SC)20-27990
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 19. (SC)20-27992
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 20. (SC)20-27993
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 21. (SC)20-27994
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 22. (SC)20-27996
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 23. (SC)20-27998
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 24. (SC)20-28000
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 25. (SC)20-28001
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 26. (SC)20-28002
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 27. (SC)20-28004
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 28. (SC)20-28006
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 29. (SC)20-28008
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 30. (SC)20-28010
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 31. (SC)20-28011
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 32. (SC)20-28014
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 33. (SC)20-28016
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 34. (SC)20-28017
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 35. (SC)20-28019
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 36. (SC)20-28020
07/31/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 37. (SC)20-28021
07/31/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief (Appellant's Opening Brief). Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)20-28040
08/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-28242
08/19/2020Notice/IncomingFiled FTB's Notice Of Lodging CD Containing Hyperlinked Opening Brief. (SC)20-30640
08/21/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (SC)20-30889
08/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent's Answering Brief Due: October 2, 2020. (SC)20-31343
10/01/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief (SC)20-36169
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 1 (SC)20-36170
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 2 (SC)20-36171
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 3 (SC)20-36172
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 4 (SC)20-36173
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 5 (SC)20-36174
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 6 (SC)20-36217
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 7 (SC)20-36175
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 8 (SC)20-36176
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 9 (SC)20-36177
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 10 (SC)20-36178
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 11 (SC)20-36179
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 12 (SC)20-36180
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 13 (SC)20-36181
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 14 (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL WITH KAYLEE) (SC)
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 15 (SC)20-36183
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 16 (SC)20-36184
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 17 (SC)20-36185
10/02/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 14 (SC)20-36255
10/28/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: November 16, 2020. (SC)20-39409
11/16/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC).20-41669
11/16/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC).
03/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Court En Banc as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)21-07930
04/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We therefore affirm the district court's denial of FTB/s attorney fees under NRCP 68 and NRS 17.115, reverse the district court's denial of costs, and remand for further proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC. (SC)21-11701
05/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-14392
05/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 25, 2021. (SC)21-14392