Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80885
Short Caption:STATE VS. LOSE (WILLIAMS)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CR-FP-18-6454Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/28/2021How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/31/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
03/31/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-12325
03/31/2020Transcript RequestFiled Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/04/20, 03/10/20. To Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. (SC).20-12351
04/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: 21 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. (SC).20-13231
04/21/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-15057
04/21/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa M. Manley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/04/20.20-15108
07/31/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief due: August 20, 2020. (SC)20-27886
08/25/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-31378
08/25/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (SC)20-31382
09/06/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-32861
10/06/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-36621
10/07/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
01/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-02706
02/05/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Matthew Pennell, Elko County Public Defender and Steffanie Foster, Elko County Chief Civil Deputy Public Defender enter their appearance as counsel for appellant). (SC)21-03600
02/05/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Kriston Hill and Benjamin Gaumond are no longer counsel in this matter). (SC)21-03601
04/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-12387
05/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-15114
05/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 1, 2021. (SC)21-15114