Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80925
Short Caption:STATE VS. SEKA (JOHN)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):37907, 37937, 44690, 45096
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159915Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/15/2021 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/15/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/06/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-12894
05/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC).20-18079
05/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC).20-19621
05/26/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC).20-19773
05/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's untimely motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The docketing statement was filed on May 26, 2020. (SC)20-19997
08/04/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Opening Brief). (SC)20-28341
08/04/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief is due: 09/03/20. (SC)20-28485
09/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (PORTIONS OF PAGES 8, 41, AND 45 STRICKEN PER 10/22/20 ORDER.) (SC)20-32639
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-32640
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2. (SC)20-32643
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3. (SC)20-32644
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 4. (SC)20-32645
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 5. (SC)20-32646
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 6. (SC)20-32647
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 7. (SC)20-32648
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 8. (SC)20-32650
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 9. (SC)20-32651
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 10. (SC)20-32654
09/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume 11. (PAGES 002522 THROUGH 002598 STRICKEN PER 10/22/20 ORDER.) (SC)20-32655
10/05/2020MotionFiled Respondent John Seka's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). (SC)20-36378
10/05/2020MotionFiled Respondent John Seka's Motion to Strike Documents and Argument Outside the Record of Appeal Included in the Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-36400
10/05/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 4, 2020. (SC)20-36439
10/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has moved to strike portions of the opening brief and documents from the appendix on the ground that the documents referred to were never considered by the district court in rendering its decision. No opposition has been filed. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall strike from the appendix pages 002522 through 002598, and the references to those documents from the opening brief on pages 8, 41, and 45. (SC)20-38726
10/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Amended Order Granting Motion. Appellant has moved to strike portions of the opening brief and documents from the appendix on the ground that the documents referred to were never considered by the district court in rendering its decision. No opposition has been filed. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall strike from the appendix pages 002522 through 002598, and the references to those documents from the opening brief on pages 8, 41, and 45. (SC)20-38761
11/04/2020BriefFiled Respondent John Seka's Answering Brief. (SC)20-40178
11/04/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)20-40179
12/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-43883
12/04/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. this matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 15, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-06429
03/31/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-09277
04/15/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. 80925. (SNP21-RP/LS/AS) (SC)
07/08/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 30. SNP21-RP/LS/AS. (SC).21-19533
07/26/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent John Seka's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-21527
08/09/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-23080
08/23/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent John Seka's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-24468
08/30/2021MotionFiled Motion of Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Respondent and En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-25191
08/30/2021BriefFiled Brief of Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice as Amicus Curiae in Support of Respondent and En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-25194
09/09/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant's answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-26115
09/21/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y21-27283