Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 80940
Short Caption:SMITH (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C342286Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/07/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/07/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-13102
04/22/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-15256
05/26/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christine Erickson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/9/19, 12/13/19, 2/26/19. (SC)20-19815
08/05/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 19, 2020. (SC)20-28641
08/19/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1-3 (SC)20-30659
08/19/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief Appellant's (SC)20-30676
09/17/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief (SC)20-34182
09/17/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Taleen Pandukht (SC)20-34183
09/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: October 19, 2020. (SC)20-35751
10/19/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to file Answering Brief. (Second Request) (SC)20-38209
10/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: November 18, 2020. (SC)20-39418
11/17/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC).20-41775
01/07/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16897
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19189
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 7, 2021. (SC)21-19189