Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Administrative Case: ADKT 0555
Short Caption:IN THE MATTER OF DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS RELATED TO THE CORONAVIRUS EMERGENCYCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Pending
Filed Date:04/07/2020Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/21/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Administrative order regarding court operations under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19 and related coronavirus filed in the 1st JD on March 16, 2020.20-13165
03/21/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Administrative order regarding Juvenile Court and Juvenile Detention Center under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19 and related coronavirus filed in the 1st JD on March 17, 2020.20-13286
03/21/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Administrative order regarding the temporary reduction of public hours of the Clerk's Offices and Juvenile Services and allowing of electronic submittal of court documents under the exigent circumstances created by COVID-19 and related coronavirus filed in the 1st JD on March 20, 2020.20-13292
03/22/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 2nd JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 2nd JD on March 16, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-2).20-13172
03/22/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 2nd JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 2nd JD on April 9, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-02(A)).20-13631
03/22/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding emergency, interim or temporary orders during the time period covered by Administrative Order 2020-02 filed in the 2nd JD on March 16, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-03).20-13173
03/22/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Amended order regarding 2nd JD's COVID-19 response filed in the 2nd JD on March 20, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-04).20-13176
03/22/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding temporarily closing in-person public access to the 2nd JD filed in the 2nd JD on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-05).20-13177
03/22/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding juvenile delinquency matters and Jan Evans Juvenile Detention Facility filed in the 2nd JD on March 24, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-06).20-13178
03/22/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 2nd JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) Probate Department filed in the 2nd JD on April 9, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-07)20-13630
03/23/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order in regards to the 3rd JD's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 3rd JD. (Administrative Order 20-01).20-13180
03/23/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 3rd JD's Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 3rd JD. (Administrative Order 20-02).20-13183
03/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 4th JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 4th JD. (Administrative Order: 1).20-13184
03/25/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 5th JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 5th JD on March 16, 2020. (Administrative Order).20-13185
03/26/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 6th JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 6th JD on March 16, 2020.20-13187
03/27/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 7th JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 7th JD on March 17, 2020.20-13188
03/27/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding temporarily suspending Local Rule prohibiting fax or e-mail filing filed in the 7th JD on March 30, 2020.20-13189
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 8th JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 8th JD. (Administrative Order: 20-01).20-13194
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the discontinuing in-person meetings or gatherings and conducting court business through social distancing filed in the 8th JD on March 16, 2020. (Administrative Order: 20-02).20-13197
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding modification of the auxiliary services provided at the Family Courts and Services Complex filed in the 8th JD on March 16, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-03).20-13198
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding temporarily closing the traffic counter at the Regional Justice Center filed in the 8th JD on March 17, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-04).20-13200
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding alternative dispute resolution, mediation, and short trial programs for the 8th JD filed in the 8th JD on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-05).20-13202
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations of criminal matters in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th JD on March 18, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-06).20-13203
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations of probate matters in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th JD on March 19, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-07).20-13205
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations of abuse and neglect matters in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th JD on March 19, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-08).20-13210
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations of civil matters in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th JD on March 20, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-09).20-13216
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th JD on March 20, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-10).20-13232
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations of civil domestic matters in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th JD on March 25, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-11).20-13236
03/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding Juvenile Court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th JD on March 27, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-12).20-13248
03/29/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 9th JD, East Fork Justice Court, Tahoe Justice Court's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 9th JD. (Administrative Order 20-01).20-13251
03/30/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 10th JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 10th JD. (Administrative Order: 20-001).20-13254
03/30/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the temporary closing of the 10th JD's Law Library filed in the 10th JD on March 19, 2020. (Administrative order 20-002).20-13257
03/31/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding the 11th JD's response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 11th JD. (Administrative Order 2020-01).20-13268
03/31/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding discontinuing in-person meetings or gatherings and conducting court through social distancing. (Administrative Order 2020-02).20-14085
04/10/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order Concerning Ongoing Administration of District Court Proceeding During COVID-19 Emergency. (AO 013).20-13791
04/14/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 10th JD on April 14, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-003).20-14164
04/15/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations response to COVID-19 filed in the 11th JD on April 15, 2020. (Administrative Order 2020-03).20-14444
04/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 6th JD on April 16, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-02).20-14675
04/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 5th JD on April 17, 2020. (Administrative Order No. 2).20-14735
04/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th JD on April 17, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-13).20-14742
04/21/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 5th JD on April 21, 2020. (Order No. 5).20-15130
04/21/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Revised order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 5th JD on April 21, 2020. (Order No. 5 Revised).20-15132
04/28/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding The 4th JD's District Court Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 4th JD on April 23, 2020. (Administrative Order 20:02).20-16041
05/04/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding The 5th JD's District Court Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 5th JD on April 30, 2020. (Order No. 4). (SC).20-16701
05/04/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding The 5th JD's District Court Response to Coronavirus Disease (COVID-19) filed in the 5th JD on May 1, 2020. (Order No. 6). (SC).20-16702
06/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding all court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th JD on June 1, 2020. (Administrative Order 20-17).20-20745
06/25/2020Administrative CaseFiled notice. Order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 10th JD on June 24, 2020. (No. AO 20-005).20-23560
11/17/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 5th JD on November 16, 2020 (Administrative Order No. 1).20-41872
11/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Notice. Order regarding court operations in response to COVID-19 filed in the 8th Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada (Administrative Order: 20-24).20-42776