Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80949
Short Caption:WOLFUS VS. BRUNK C/W 80613Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:80613*, 80949Related Case(s):76052, 80613
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A756971Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/16/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/08/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-13258
04/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-13261
04/16/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Notice of Potential Dismissal for Failure to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (SC).20-14550
04/16/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from James R. Christensen. Check no. 2092. (SC)
04/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-14635
04/22/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-15171
04/30/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Consolidation of Appeals. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC).20-16370
05/06/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC).20-17131
05/07/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-17376
05/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals. The parties' stipulation to consolidate these appeals is approved and these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Appellant shall have until August 20, 2020, to file and serve a combined opening brief addressing all issues in both appeals and a combined appendix. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC).20-18022
08/19/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Combined Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-30559
08/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 21, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-31148
09/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/21/20). Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Vol. 2 (part 2 continued). Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-34595
09/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief due: 5 days. 80613/80949. (SC)20-34612
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Vols. 1 & 2 (part 1). Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-34634
09/24/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (corrected). Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-35245
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1 part 1 (Corrected). Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-36074
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2 part 1 (Corrected). Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-36075
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-36076
10/01/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-36077
10/22/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-38723
10/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents' Answering Brief due: November 25, 2020. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-38737
11/25/2020BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-43118
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Respondents' Answering Brief - Volume I of I. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)20-43122
12/19/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-45931
12/21/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 27, 2021. (SC)20-45985
01/27/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)21-02541
01/27/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)21-11110
06/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)21-18872
07/26/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-21584
07/26/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2021. Nos. 80613/80949. (SC)21-21584