Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80954
Short Caption:THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS. NV EAGLES, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A733789Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/08/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-13372
04/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-13376
04/16/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26001703. (SC)
04/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-14644
04/22/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-15169
04/27/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Appellant counsel Nicholas Belay/Akerman LLP. (SC)20-15828
05/01/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Transcriber Christine Erickson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/10/19. (SC)20-16635
05/05/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/10/19. To Court Reporter: Christine Erickson. Notice of Transcript Request. (SC)20-17042
05/07/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-17433
08/18/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for an Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-30435
08/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. The stipulation of the parties extending the time for filing the opening brief is approved. Opening brief and appendix due: September 21, 2020. (SC)20-31161
09/18/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (SC)20-34540
09/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until October 21, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-35015
10/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-38671
10/21/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1 (SC)20-38673
10/21/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 (SC)20-38674
10/21/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3 (SC)20-38675
10/21/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4 (SC)20-38676
10/21/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5 (SC)20-38677
10/21/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6 (SC)20-38678
10/21/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7 (SC)20-38679
11/20/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Stipulation To Extend Time To File Answering Brief. (SC)20-42541
11/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 21, 2020. (SC)20-42642
12/11/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-45142
12/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until January 20, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-46326
01/20/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time To File Answering Brief. (Unopposed 2nd Request) (SC)21-01704
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-02810
02/12/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-04378
03/15/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: March 29, 2021. (SC)21-07346
03/29/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-09016
03/30/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)21-21211
07/22/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-21212
08/16/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-23764
08/16/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
09/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2021. (SC)21-23764