Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80965
Short Caption:UNITED AUTO. INS. CO. VS. DIST. CT. (NALDER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78085, 78243, 79487
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A549111, A772220Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/13/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Daniel F. Polsenberg. (SC)
04/13/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, Alternatively, Prohibition. (SC)20-13833
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)20-13834
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)20-13835
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)20-13836
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)20-13837
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)20-13838
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC)20-13839
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (SC)20-13840
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (SC)20-13841
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (SC)20-13842
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (SC)20-13843
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (SC)20-13844
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (SC)20-13845
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13. (SC)20-13846
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 14. (SC)20-13847
04/13/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 15. (SC)20-13848
04/13/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Extend District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27(e) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay (Immediate Action Required). (SC)20-13849
04/13/2020MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Judicial Notice of Related Proceedings. (SC)20-13850
04/15/2020OtherChief Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges
04/20/2020MotionFiled Cheyenne Nalder's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27(e) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay. (SC)20-14993
04/20/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Gary Lewis' Opposition to UAIC's Motion for Judicial Notice of Related Proceedings. (SC)20-15003
04/20/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Gary Lewis' Opposition to UAIC's Motion to Extend District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Opposition to Rule 27(E) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay. (SC)20-15005
04/22/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [In light of this order, we deny as moot petitioner's emergency motion for stay and motion for judicial notice.] NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC).20-15174
05/18/2020RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)20-18899
05/18/2020Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)