Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80983
Short Caption:9101 ALTA LLC VS. PENNYMAC MORTG. INV. TR. HOLDINGS 1, LLC C/W 81112Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:80983*, 81112Related Case(s):81112
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A776933Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/16/2020 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-14074
04/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-14077
04/14/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael N. Beede. (SC)
04/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-14173
04/16/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (SC).20-14535
05/04/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: May 20, 2020. (SC).20-16818
05/12/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-18062
05/15/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)20-18684
05/20/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-19271
05/22/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Consolidate. (SC). (REJECTED PER 05/22/20 NOTICE).
05/22/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: June 12, 2020. (SC).20-19607
05/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (Respondents' Motion to Consolidate). (SC).20-19609
05/22/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC).20-19633
06/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals. 9101 ALTA LLC and Pennymac shall each have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request pursuant to NRAP 9(a). 9101 ALTA and Pennymac shall each have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve their opening briefs and appendices in each appeal. Within 30 days of the filing of the opening briefs, Pennymac shall file an answering brief in Docket No. 80983 and 9101 ALTA shall file a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 81112. Thereafter, 9101 ALTA shall have 30 days to file a reply brief in Docket No. 80983, if deemed necessary, and Pennymac shall have 30 days to file a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 81112. Finally, 9101 ALTA shall thereafter have 30 days to file a reply brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 81112, if deemed necessary. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-21464
06/22/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant 9101 Alta LLC's Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-23121
07/30/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/17/18, 9/18/18, 9/26/18, 10/30/18, 11/26/19, and 2/4/20. Nos. 80983/81112. ((SC)20-27854
08/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Tenesa S. Powell). Nos. 80983/81112.(SC)20-29881
08/20/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Rule 46 Substitution of Attorneys (William R. Killip, Jr., in place and stead of Mike Beede as counsel for Appellant). Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-30678
08/25/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant and respondent/cross-appellant 9101 Alta LLC has filed a substitution of attorneys. The clerk of this court shall add William R. Killip, Jr. and The Law Offices of William R. Killip, Jr. to the docket and service list in the place and stead of Mike Beede of The Law Office of Mike Beede, PLLC, as counsel for appellant and respondent/cross-appellant 9101 Alta LLC. Nos. 80983/81112 (SC)20-31269
08/25/2020MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-31414
08/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant and respondent/cross-appellant 9101 Alta LLC's opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 80983 due: October 8, 2020. Respondents and appellants/cross-respondents Pennymac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC; and Pennymac Holdings, LLC's opening brief on appeal in Docket No. 81112 remains due to be filed on or before September 8, 2020. Nos. 80983/81112 (SC)20-31816
08/31/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-31951
08/31/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants/Cross-Respondents Pennymac Mortgage Investment Trust Holdings I, LLC and Pennymac Holdings, LLC's Opening Brief Due: October 8, 2020. (SC)20-32035
10/07/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion to Submit Volumes 13-16 of Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-36865
10/07/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion to Submit Volumes 13-16 of Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-36866
10/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (9101 Alta LLC). Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37033
10/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (PennyMac Mortgage Investment Holdings I, LLC). Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37034
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume XII. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37035
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume I. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37042
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume II. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37046
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume III. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37047
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume IV. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37048
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume V. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37049
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VI. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37050
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VII. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37051
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume VIII. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37052
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume IX. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37053
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume X. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37054
10/08/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume XI. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37055
10/12/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The parties have filed a joint motion to file certain volumes of the appendix under seal. The motion is denied without prejudice because it is not accompanied by a copy of the proposed appendix. Nos. 80983/81112 (SC)20-37323
10/12/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion to Submit Volumes 13-16 of Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-37377
10/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The parties have filed a joint motion to file certain volumes of the appendix under seal because they contain confidential information sealed by the district court. The motion is granted. SRCR 7. The clerk of this court shall file under seal volumes 13-16 of the appendix received on October 12, 2020. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-38688
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appendix Vols. 13-16 (SEALED) Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)
11/09/2020BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Answering Brief. (Pennymac's Response Brief). NOS 80983/81112 (SC)20-40973
11/09/2020BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (9101 Alta LLC). Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-40990
12/04/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Nos. 80983/81112 (SC)20-44102
12/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant 9101 Alta LLC shall have until December 23, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief on appeal in Docket No. 80983. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until December 23, 2020, to file and serve the combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 81112. 9101 Alta shall have until January 25, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal in Docket No. 81112, if deemed necessary. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-44375
12/23/2020BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief and Response to Alta's Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal for case no. 81112. Nos 80983/81112. (SC)20-46296
12/23/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (9101 Alta - No. 80983). Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)20-46471
02/10/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP21-RP/LS/AS Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)21-13958
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16333
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. Nos. 80983/81112. (SC)21-16333