Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 80985
Short Caption:BAKER (MATTHEW) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 19EW000391BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:HerndonCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Chief Justice Hardesty for Justice HerndonPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/30/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-14101
04/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause and Suspending Briefing. Appellant's counsel shall have 21 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent shall have 14 days from the filing of any response to file any reply. The briefing of this appeal is suspended until further order of this court. (SC).20-15212
05/13/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC).20-18316
05/27/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC).20-20081
06/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC)20-21758
06/12/2020Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 12/12/19 Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (SC)20-21996
06/23/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC)20-23346
09/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (SC)20-33117
09/08/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-33118
09/08/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)20-33119
09/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Presentence Report. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the presentence investigation report in a sealed envelope. (SC)20-33343
09/17/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Letter in Response to the Order Directing Transmission of Presentence Report (First Judicial District Court). (SC)20-34314
09/21/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Presentence Report. The Eighth Judicial District Court Clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the presentence investigation report filed in district court case number 04C200221-6 in a sealed envelope. (SC)20-34650
09/22/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. (SC)20-34787
10/09/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 22, 2020. (SC)20-37118
10/21/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-38592
10/26/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent has filed a motion for a second extension of time (20 days) to file the answering brief. The motion is granted. Answering brief due: November 10, 2020. (SC)20-39177
10/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC)
11/10/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-41090
11/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 24, 2020. (SC)20-42018
11/24/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-42919
11/30/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (DETACHED APPENDIX AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 12/2/2020). (SC)20-43359
12/02/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief was filed on November 30, 2020. The clerk of this court shall detach the appendix attached to the answering brief, and file it separately. Appellant shall have until December 30, 2020, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)20-43651
12/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC)20-43653
12/02/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2. (SC)20-43659
12/30/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-46952
12/30/2020Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)
03/18/2021OtherJustice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
04/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." JH/EC/KP. (SC)21-10792
05/10/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13275
05/10/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2021. (SC)21-13275