Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80987
Short Caption:GARCIA (RAMON) VS. WARDEN C/W 80988Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:80987*, 80988Related Case(s):42403, 44006, 47059, 48123, 56137, 62119, 65158, 65777, 69458, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A811177, C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/09/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-14131
04/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals, Directing Transmission of Records, and Regarding Briefing. In the interest of judicial economy, these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. Nos. 80987/80988. (SC).20-15201
05/13/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - A811177 - VOL 1. Nos. 80987/80988. (SC)20-18264
05/14/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-11 - 01C178581 (via FTP). Nos. 80987/80988. (SC).20-18377
05/19/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (C178581) - SEALED Pages 282-289, 1-57, 210, 1302-1304, 1305, 1853-1855, 1856, 2002-2008, 2214-2215, and 2216-2221. (SC)
05/19/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (A811177) - SEALED Pages 43-48, 49-50, and 51-53. (SC)
07/24/2020BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 80987/80988. (SC)20-27099
09/09/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. Nos. 80987/80988 (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH. Nos. 80987/80988 (SC)21-11066
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13432
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. Nos. 80987/80988. (SC)21-13432
07/15/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Proper Person Motion to Proceed to Federal Court 2254 Habeas Corpus. (SC)21-20493