Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81015
Short Caption:SOTELO VS. BOUCHARDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A740711Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/08/2020 / Kuzemka, KristineSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/16/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/16/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-14510
04/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-14513
05/01/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie. Check no. 200634. (SC)
05/01/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-16662
05/08/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC)20-17583
05/22/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: June 5, 2020. (SC).20-19671
05/29/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 22, 2020, at 10:00 AM. (SC)20-20294
06/05/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-21288
06/23/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-23213
06/29/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-23972
07/13/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Transcript Request due: July 27, 2020. (SC).20-25720
07/27/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/27/17, 09/12/19, 09/13/19, 11/21/19 and 01/28/20. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC)20-27323
09/14/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sandra Harrell stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/27/17, 09/12/19, 09/13/19, 11/21/19 and 01/28/20. (SC)20-33737
09/28/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-35648
09/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 28, 2020. (SC)20-35785
10/28/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-39559
11/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 30, 2020. (SC).20-40708
11/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Erik J. Foley of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP as counsel for appellant). (SC)20-43369
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1, Part 1 (1-250). (SC)20-43370
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2 (251-500). (SC)20-43371
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3, Part 1 (501-750). (SC)20-43372
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4, Part 1 (751-1000). (SC)20-43374
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5 (1001-1250). (SC)20-43375
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6 (1251-1500). (SC)20-43376
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7 (1501-1750). (SC)20-43377
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8 (1751-2000). (SC)20-43378
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9 (2001-2250). (SC)20-43379
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 10, Part 1 (2251-2500). (SC)20-43381
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 11, Part 1 (2501-2750). (SC)20-43383
11/30/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 12 (2751-2987). (SC)20-43384
11/30/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-43385
12/23/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: January 13, 2021. (SC)20-46352
01/12/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-00990
02/11/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)21-04204
02/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until April 12, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)21-04811
04/12/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-10569
04/13/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16904
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19190
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 7, 2021. (SC)21-19190