Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81026
Short Caption:LOPEZ VS. PROGRESSIVE N. INSURANCE CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A790574Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/30/2020 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/17/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-14717
04/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-14719
04/27/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Kenneth L. Hall. Check no. 3485. (SC)
04/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-15929
04/30/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC)20-16379
05/08/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-17574
05/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (SC)20-17607
05/12/2020Docketing StatementFiled Certificate of Mailing (To Settlement Judge) re: Docketing Statement. (SC)20-18011
05/19/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference is continued pending the outcome of a district court hearing scheduled for May 26, 2020. (SC)20-19091
06/11/2020Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Respondent's Amended Motion To Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-21866
06/16/2020Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Appellant's Opposition To Respondent's Motion To Dismiss Appellant's Notice of Appeal. (SC)20-22371
06/17/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-22656
06/18/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Stayed. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. The settlement proceedings are concluded and this appeal may proceed. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) shall remain suspended. (SC)20-22820
06/25/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Notice of Appeal. (REJECTED PER 6/26/20 NOTICE). (SC)
06/26/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Respondent's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Notice of Appeal. (SC)20-23772
06/26/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Notice of Appeal. (SC)20-23816
06/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's untimely motion for an extension of time to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss is granted. Respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply. (SC)20-24119
06/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Notice of Appeal. (SC)20-24181
07/06/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. The motion to dismiss this appeal is denied at this time. Briefing of this appeal is reinstated. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file, in this court, a file-stamped transcript request form. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-24780
07/09/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-25419
10/05/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service for Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-36479
10/05/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/5/2020) (SC)
10/05/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)20-36521
10/06/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-36573
10/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service for Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-36576
10/06/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1-3 (SC)20-36577
10/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service Certificate of Mailing. (SC)20-36763
10/28/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: November 19, 2020. (SC)20-39486
11/19/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-42320
11/19/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service for Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-42322
12/17/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: January 4, 2021. (SC)20-45725
01/13/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 1/13/21) (SC)
01/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-01065
01/13/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time To File Reply Brief. (DETACHED THE REPLY BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 01/14/2021). (SC)21-01095
01/14/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall detach the reply brief from the motion and file it separately. (SC)21-01180
01/14/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-01181
01/14/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13961
06/02/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: June 15, 2021. (SC)21-15595
06/14/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition For Rehearing To The Nevada Supreme Court En Banc. (SC)21-17060
06/14/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Kenneth L. Hall. (SC)
06/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-18516
07/09/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: July 26, 2021. (SC)21-19704
07/22/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-21166
09/15/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-26730