Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81028
Short Caption:GRAVELLE (DANIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CR-FP-19-644Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/17/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/17/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-14729
05/02/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-16689
06/16/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Manley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/10/19, 12/13/19, 1/7/20, 1/8/20, 1/9/20, 1/10/20, 3/26/20. (SC)20-22390
08/17/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix Due: August 31, 2020. (SC)20-30278
08/31/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-31979
09/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: September 30, 2020. (SC)20-32575
09/07/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Under Seal the Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)20-32881
09/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the presentence investigation report in a sealed envelope. (SC)20-33156
09/25/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED) (SC)
09/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for the Transmittal of Exhibits Filed in the District Court. (SC)20-35693
09/29/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 1 (SC)20-35706
09/29/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 2 (SC)20-35736
09/29/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (SC)20-35737
10/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for the transmission of four original exhibits to this court. The motion is denied without prejudice. (SC)20-36959
10/28/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: November 12, 2020. (SC)20-39482
11/10/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-41144
12/30/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
03/23/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Matthew Pennell and Steffanie Foster. (SC)21-08319
03/23/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Benjamin Gaumond. (SC)21-08335
04/19/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11240
05/14/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13916
05/14/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 18, 2021. (SC)21-13916