Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81042
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62835, 67598, 67741, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088, 83088-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/17/2020How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/21/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/21/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-15077
04/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)20-16284
05/06/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Modify and/or Correct Illegal Sentence. (SC).20-17116
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motion. Appellant has also filed a "Motion to Modify or Correct Illegal Sentence" in this court. This court takes no action on the motion as it appears the relief requested is properly sought in the district court. (SC).20-17539
05/19/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Volumes 1 - 8 via FTP. (SC)20-18998
05/20/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's "Motion to Further Define the Contents Within the Order Regarding Motion."20-19202
05/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service for Appellant's "Motion to Further Define the Contents Within the Order Regarding Motion." (SC)20-19205
05/22/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 6, 2020, appellant filed a "Motion to Modify or Correct Illegal Sentence" in this court. On May 8, 2020, this court entered an order deferring its ruling on the motion. Appellant seeks clarification of the order. This court takes no action on appellant's motion filed on May 6, 2020. The court will consider appellant's motion in its disposition of the appeal. (SC).20-19581
05/26/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1734-1765 (SEALED). (SC)
05/26/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 228-237 (SEALED). (SC)
06/02/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Further Define the Contents Within the "Order Regarding Motion". (SC)20-20744
06/09/2020Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Appellant Appeals this Court's Order to "Take no Action" on a Motion to "Modify or Correct an Illegal Sentence."" (SC).20-21682
06/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. This court has entered two orders regarding appellant's "Motion to Modify and/or Correct Illegal Sentence" filed on May 8, 2020, and indicating that the motion will be considered at the time of disposition of this appeal. Appellant's "Motion to Further Define the Contents Within the 'Order Regarding Motion'" and "Appellant Appeals this Court's Order to 'Take no Action' on a Motion to 'Modify or Correct an Illegal Sentence'" are denied. (SC).20-22161
09/17/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Documents (SEALED) pages 228-237. (SC)
09/21/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Documents (SEALED) pages 1746 to 1777. (SC)
09/24/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).20-35177
09/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
11/20/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[We have reviewed all documents Grimes has filed in this matter, and we conclude no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
02/19/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-04977
02/19/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
03/16/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2021. (SC)21-04977