Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81054
Short Caption:NATIONSTAR MORTG. LLC VS. LAS VEGAS RENTAL & REPAIR, LLC SER. 63Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80485
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A698830Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/22/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26001708. (SC)
04/22/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-15265
04/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-15267
04/23/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-15367
05/07/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-17420
05/13/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-18227
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Melanie D. Morgan as Counsel for Appellant. (SC)20-24108
08/17/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Appellant Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Opening Brief and Appendices. (SC)20-30254
08/17/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-30259
09/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (SC)20-34752
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 Part 2 (REJECTED PER CONVERSATION WITH CARLA) (SC)
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 Part 1 (REJECTED PER CONVERSATION WITH CARLA). (SC)
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol. 2 Part 2 (REJECTED PER CONVERSATION WITH CARLA) (SC)
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2 Part 1 (REJECTED PER CONVERSATION WITH CARLA) (SC)
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 3 (SC)20-34757
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 4 (SC)20-34758
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 5 (SC)20-34759
09/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 6 (SC)20-34761
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 Part 1 (SC)20-34816
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 Part 2 (SC)20-34817
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2 Part 1 (SC)20-34824
09/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2 Part 2 (SC)20-34823
10/19/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 4, 2020. (SC).20-38296
11/04/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-40266
11/04/2020AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1 (SC)20-40267
12/01/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-43500
12/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 4, 2021. (SC)20-43537
01/05/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)21-00292
01/05/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-00293
01/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion requesting a second extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief was filed on January 5, 2021. (SC)21-00404
01/07/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11079
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13433
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13433