Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81058
Short Caption:SATICOY BAY LLC SER. 5733 OASIS RIDGE VS. MARINERS ATL. PORTFOLIO, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A693884Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/16/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/23/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-15384
04/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-15386
04/27/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael F. Bohn. (SC)
04/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-16015
04/29/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-16161
05/12/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-18076
05/19/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-19035
07/27/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys for Appellant. (SC)20-27208
08/14/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-30055
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 1. (SC)20-30056
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol 2. (SC)20-30057
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3. (SC)20-30058
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4. (SC)20-30059
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5, Part 1. (SC)20-30060
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6. (SC)20-30061
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 7, Part 1. (SC)20-30063
09/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Disassociation for Chet Glover. (SC)20-32780
09/11/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-33621
09/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved to file Answering Brief, Due date 10/14/202020-33624
10/12/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-37371
11/12/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-41315
11/12/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-11115
04/21/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Disassociation and Withdrawal of Counsel Michael S. Kelley and R. Samuel Ehlers. Wright Finlay & Zak, LLP request that Christina V. Miller, Esq. receive all future notices. (SC)21-11489
04/27/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Counsel. Attorney Christina Miller of Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP, has filed a notice stating that (1) she is counsel of record for respondent, (2) Michael S. Kelley and R. Samuel Ehlers are no longer attorneys associated with Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP, and (3) Wright Finlay & Zak, LLP will continue to represent respondent. Miller requests that she receive all future notices. this court elects to treat the notice as a notice of appearance and directs the clerk to add Miller as counsel of record for respondent. The clerk shall remove Michael S. Kelley and R. Samuel Ehlers as counsel of record for respondent. (SC)21-12038
06/30/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-18874
07/27/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-21642
07/27/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2021. (SC)21-21642