Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81071
Short Caption:SCOTT (CHRISTIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73182
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR161210Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/04/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/24/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/24/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-15682
04/28/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC).20-16095
04/28/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC).20-16096
08/14/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-30083
08/14/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-30085
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)20-30086
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC)20-30087
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC)20-30088
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC)20-30089
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC)20-30090
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 (part 1). (SC)20-30091
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 (part 2). (SC)20-30092
08/14/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. (SC)20-30093
09/11/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief. (REJECTED - NOT COUNSEL OF RECORD). (SC)
09/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief - No Notice of Appearance. (SC)20-33531
09/11/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Marilee Cate / Washoe County Deputy District Attorney Appearing as Counsel for Respondent. (SC)20-33579
09/11/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-33584
09/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Counsel and Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall add attorney Marilee Cate as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent shall have until October 14, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-33852
10/14/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-37823
11/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-40063
11/04/2020Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19793
08/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22480
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 6, 2021. (SC)21-22480