Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81080
Short Caption:BUNDY VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79058
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A779718Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/29/2020 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/27/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/27/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-15866
04/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-15868
04/28/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Craig A. Mueller. (SC)
04/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-16063
04/29/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC)20-16175
04/30/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-16432
05/13/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 29, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC)20-18233
07/28/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 9, 2020, at 9:30 AM. (SC)20-27534
09/09/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-33200
09/17/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-34219
12/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-44780
12/31/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Change of Address for Christopher Mixson, new address and firm. (SC)20-47085
01/08/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Errata to Notice of Change of Address for Counsel for Respondent Center for Biological Diversity. (SC)21-00664
01/25/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $250 or Transcript Request Form, Opening Brief and Appendix or a Motion due: 14 days. (SC)21-02194
02/08/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-03797
02/08/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/7/20. To Court Reporter: Nancy Maldonado. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/9/21) (SC)21-03798
02/09/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-03826
02/12/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/13/18, 2/26/19, 3/19/19, 5/16/19, and 4/7/20. To Court Reporter: Nancy Maldonado. (SC)21-04345
02/16/2021MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)21-04422
02/17/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-04697
02/19/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. fjn1[Based on this filing and the filing of the transcript request form on February 12, 2021, the conditional sanction imposed in this court's January 25, 2021, order is automatically vacated.] (SC)21-05075
03/31/2021MotionFiled Respondent's (Center for Biological Diversity) Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Failure to File a Timely Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-09316
04/02/2021BriefFiled Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE). (SC)
04/05/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Opening Brief. (SC)21-09696
04/05/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)21-09704
04/05/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/20/21.) (SC)
04/05/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix (Volume I - III). (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/20/21.) (SC)
04/05/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix (Volume II). (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/20/21.) (SC)
04/05/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix (Volume III). (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/20/21.) (SC)
04/06/2021MotionFiled Respondent Center for Biological Diversity's Opposition to Appellant Bundy's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)21-09909
04/12/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to Opposition Regarding Motion for Extension. (SC)21-10437
04/20/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed." The clerk shall strike the opening brief and appendix filed on April 5, 2021. NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11480
05/07/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (REJECTING PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/10/21) (SC)
05/10/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-13265
05/10/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-13297
05/10/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Craig A. Mueller. (SC)
05/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-14081
05/27/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's (Center for Biological Diversity) Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-15224
06/14/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16941
07/09/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19720
07/09/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 12, 2021. (SC)21-19720