Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81088
Short Caption:JARAMILLO (JONATHAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73720
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR160724Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/02/2020How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/28/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
04/28/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-16031
05/04/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-16781
05/04/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-16782
08/21/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-30955
08/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC).20-30956
08/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC).20-30957
08/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC).20-30958
08/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC).20-30959
08/21/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC).20-30960
09/21/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 5, 2020. (SC)20-34660
10/05/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-36491
11/01/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-39788
11/02/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16890
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19191
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 8, 2021. (SC)21-19191