Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81109
Short Caption:SZYMBORSKI VS. SPRING MOUNTAIN TREATMENT CTR.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66398, 80243, 80362
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A700178Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing in Progress
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/30/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
04/30/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-16425
04/30/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-16427
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC).20-17525
05/11/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: June 4, 2020. (SC)20-17754
05/11/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/23/19, 09/26/19, 10/18/19, 11/05/19, 11/12/19, 11/19/19, 12/30/19, 02/07/20, 02/24/20, 02/25/20, 03/03/20, 03/06/20, 03/10/20 and 03/27/20. To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC)20-17826
05/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court declines to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time. However, as this appeal proceeds, this court will consider the necessity of transcripts and may order their preparation at a later date. (SC)20-18699
06/04/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volumes 1-7 (Via FTP). (SC)20-20952
06/05/2020Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-21293
06/10/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 22 to 25, 26 to 28, 564 to 566, 567 to 569, 1019 to 1021, 1031 to 1033 and 1036 to 1037 (SEALED). (SC)
06/16/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for a 30-Day Extension of Time to File Opening Informal Brief. (SC)20-22434
06/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Informal Brief due: September 30, 2020. (SC)20-22767