Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81138
Short Caption:HILL VS. PARKER C/W 80451Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:80451*, 81138Related Case(s):80451
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A757380Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/20/2020 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-17088
05/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-17094
05/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-17096
05/06/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Micah S. Echols for Appellant. (SC)20-17190
05/13/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Filing Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-18149
05/18/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Claggett & Sykes Law Firm. Check no. 13981. (SC)
05/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-18854
05/20/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (SC)20-19159
06/01/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-20586
06/04/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)20-20948
06/08/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: June 22, 2020. (SC)20-21471
06/17/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/13/19, 8/20/19 To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. (SC)20-22611
06/18/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals. (SC)20-22718
06/23/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Docketing Statement (Second Request). (SC)20-23328
06/23/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (SC)20-23329
06/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions and Consolidating Appeals. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement in Docket No. 81138 is granted. The docketing statement was filed on June 23, 2020. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)20-24234
07/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)20-25689
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 1. Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32450
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 2.Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32451
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 3. Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32452
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 4. Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32453
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 5. Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32454
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 6. Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32455
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 7. Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32456
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 8. Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32457
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 9 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32458
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 10 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32459
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 11 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32460
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 12 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32461
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 13 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32464
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 14 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32465
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 15 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32466
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 16 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32467
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 17 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32468
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 18 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32469
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 19 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32470
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 20 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32471
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 21 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32472
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 22 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32473
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 23 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32474
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 24 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32475
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 25 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32476
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 26 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32477
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 27 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32478
09/02/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 28 Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32479
09/02/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request)Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-32480
09/11/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until October 2, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)20-33610
10/02/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Third Request). Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)20-36360
10/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief due: October 23, 2020. Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-36963
10/23/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Fourth Request). No. 80451/81138. (SC)20-39029
10/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: October 29, 2020. No. 80451/81138. (SC)20-39358
10/29/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)20-39745
11/25/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time (First Request) (Respondent's Answering Brief). Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)20-43148
11/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: January 11, 2021. Nos. 80451/81138 (SC)20-43322
01/08/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-00672
02/03/2021MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief (First Request). Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-03364
02/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Motion Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 10, 2021. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-03388
03/10/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-07045
03/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 24, 2021. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-07792
03/24/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos 80451/81138. (SC)21-08483
03/25/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-19804
07/16/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: August 10, 2021. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-20628
08/10/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (Second Request). Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-23276
08/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: August 24, 2021. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC21-23799
08/24/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-24722
08/24/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Micah S. Echols. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)
08/25/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Supplement to Amended Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 80451/81138. (SC)21-24723
09/09/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). JH/RP/MG. Nos 80451/81138. (SC)21-26116
09/23/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration due: October 7, 2021. Nos 80451/81138. (SC)21-27512