Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81139
Short Caption:MEYER (CHELSEA) VS. SHERIFFCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR201108Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-17115
05/12/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC).20-17974
05/12/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC).20-17975
09/02/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)20-32430
09/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: October 5, 2020. (SC)20-32448
09/30/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-35839
09/30/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (SC)20-35841
11/02/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time (Answering Brief). (SC)20-39858
11/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 2, 2020. (SC)20-39898
12/02/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-43704
12/24/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-46536
12/24/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/14/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)21-16937
07/01/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC)21-18922
07/27/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-21643
07/27/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/06/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 2, 2021. (SC)21-21643