Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81143
Short Caption:MORRISSEY VS. RIZZO C/W 80213Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:80213*, 81143Related Case(s):77997, 77997-COA, 80213
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A757932Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/20/2020 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/14/2021How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/06/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/06/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-17164
05/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-17166
05/06/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-17168
05/13/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC).20-18315
05/19/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kenneth Long. Money Order no. 19-079688309. (SC)
05/20/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-19139
05/20/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (SC)20-19212
06/09/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-21688
06/10/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals with Exhibits. (SC)20-21835
06/29/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The premediation conference is continued because whether to proceed with a settlement conference is still under consideration. (SC).20-24072
07/27/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-27304
07/30/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing Docket No. 81143 from Settlement Program, Consolidating Appeals, and Reinstating Briefing. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-27794
08/06/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/19/18 and 03/10/20. To Court Reporter: De'Awna Takas. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-29082
08/18/2020Transcript RequestFiled Motion for Production of Transcripts (No Hearing Requested). Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-30437
11/10/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/12/20). Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)
11/10/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. Nos. 80213/81143 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/12/20). (SC)
11/10/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/12/20). Nos, 80213/81143 (SC)
11/10/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/12/20). Nos. 80213/81143 (SC)
11/10/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/12/20). Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)
11/10/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/12/20). Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)
11/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-41380
11/12/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief due: November 12, 2020. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-41390
11/12/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-41392
11/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-41393
11/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-41394
11/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-41395
11/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-41396
11/12/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-41397
11/17/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder De'Awna Takas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/27/18. (SC)20-41926
12/10/2020MotionFiled Stipulation Extending the Date to File Respondent's Answering Brief (First Request). Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-44941
12/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 13, 2021. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)20-44948
01/13/2021AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix - Volume 1. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)21-01170
01/13/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)21-01171
02/04/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 26, 2021. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)21-03430
02/26/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)21-05781
02/26/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)
03/05/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance and Notice of Change of Firm Name (Adam R. Trippiedi is appearing as counsel for respondent Joseph Rizzo in this matter along with Michael F. Bohn). Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)21-06513
03/17/2021OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings
05/14/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)21-13891
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNPE21-RP/LS/AS Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)21-13901
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16313
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. Nos. 80213/81143. (SC)21-16313