Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 48123
Short Caption:GARCIA (RAMON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):42403, 44006, 47059, 56137, 62119, 65158, 65777, 69458, 70604, 70604-COA, 71005, 71005-COA, 71006, 71006-COA, 80987, 80988
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C178581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice DouglasPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/03/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.06-19842
09/27/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
10/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days.06-20493
10/31/2006Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 10/25/06.06-22209
11/03/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 9.06-22537
11/03/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person.06-23512
09/06/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-WM/MG/MC.07-19616
10/16/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c).07-22845
11/13/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur.07-24581
11/13/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/03/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 15, 2007.07-24581