Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81165
Short Caption:GRYPHON GOLD CORP. VS. WATERTON GLOBAL RES. MGMT., INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1801557Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/20/2020 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/12/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/12/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-18000
05/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-18002
05/15/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Woodburn and Wedge. Check no. 111252. (SC)
05/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-18815
05/20/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. (SC)20-19191
06/08/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-21408
06/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). (SC)20-21453
06/08/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Supplemental Certificate of Service of Docketing Statement. (Served on Settlement Judge). (SC).20-21518
06/15/2020Docketing StatementFiled Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC).20-22301
06/19/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-22934
06/25/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).20-23581
07/09/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/21/18, 11/27/18, 12/20/18, 09/18/19. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (SC).20-25420
07/15/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/18/19. (SC).20-25939
07/15/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Nicole Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/21/18. (SC).20-25940
07/15/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Constance Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/27/18, 12/20/18. (SC).20-25942
09/21/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. (SC)20-34577
09/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant shall have until October 23, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have until November 23, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have until December 23, 2020, to file and serve a reply brief if deemed necessary. (SC)20-34993
10/22/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-38817
10/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 3, 2020. (SC)20-39295
10/28/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Associate Counsel. (SC)20-39535
10/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney (Jeremy J. Nork counsel for Respondents). (SC)20-39725
11/03/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-40114
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume I. (SC)20-40115
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume III. (SC)20-40116
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume II. (SC)20-40117
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume IV. (SC)20-40118
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume V. (SC)20-40119
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume VI. (SC)20-40120
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume VII. (SC)20-40121
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume IX. (SC)20-40122
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume X. (SC)20-40123
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume VIII. (SC)20-40124
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume XI. (SC)20-40125
11/03/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume XII. (SC)20-40126
11/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents have filed a motion to associate attorney Shannon Wells Stevenson of Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP, in this matter pursuant to SCR 42. The motion is granted. Ms. Stevenson shall be permitted to appear on behalf of respondents in this appeal. (SC)20-40827
11/24/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. (SC)20-42845
11/30/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until January 15, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have until February 12, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)20-43283
01/08/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)21-00662
01/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until January 29, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)21-01390
01/29/2021BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)21-02942
01/29/2021AppendixFiled Respondents' Supplemental Appendix, Volume 1. (SC)21-02943
01/29/2021AppendixFiled Respondents' Supplemental Appendix, Volume 1. (SC)21-02946
02/12/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief. (SC)21-04309
02/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have until March 1, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)21-04650
03/01/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-06014
03/02/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/09/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] JH/RP/MG (SC)21-19803
08/03/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-22482
08/03/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/20/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 6, 2021. (SC)21-22482