Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81185
Short Caption:T.L. TOWNSEND BUILDERS, LLC VS. NEV. STATE CONTRACTORS BD. C/W 80518Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:80518*, 81185Related Case(s):80518
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A762357Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/29/2020 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/15/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/15/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-18551
05/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-18553
05/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-18555
05/26/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (SC)20-19890
05/27/2020MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Consolidate NV Supreme Court Appeal No. 80518 & Appeal No. 81185. (SC)20-19966
05/29/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from The Law Office of A.J. Kung, Inc. Check no. 3004. (SC)
05/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-20324
05/29/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC)20-20355
06/18/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)20-22808
07/02/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 25, 2020, at 1:30 pm. Case nos. 80518/81185. (SC).20-24528
07/02/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 80518/81185. (SC).20-24529
07/13/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion, Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We grant the parties' joint motion and consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC).20-25664
07/27/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/29/20, and 3/11/20. To Court Reporter: None Listed. (REJECTED PER 7/28/20 NOTICE). (SC)
07/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-27465
07/29/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/29/20, 3/11/20 To Court Reporter: None Listed. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-27681
10/09/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 26, 2020. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC)20-37206
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Table of Contents. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38765
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38762
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38770
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38771
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38772
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38773
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6 Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38774
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 7. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38776
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38777
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38778
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 10. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38779
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 11. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38780
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 12. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38781
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 13. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38782
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 14. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38783
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 15. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38784
10/22/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 16. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-38785
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 17. Nos. 80518/81185 (SC)20-39217
10/26/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos 80518/81185. (SC)20-39220
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Amended Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC)20-39229
10/26/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Amended Opening Brief. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC)20-39231
11/24/2020BriefFiled Respondent Nevada State Contractors Board's Answering Brief. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC).20-42901
11/24/2020AppendixFiled Respondent Nevada State Contractors Board's Appendix. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC).20-42903
12/24/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC)20-46553
12/24/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Supplement to Appendix- Volume 18. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC)20-46554
12/24/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC)21-11076
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13423
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. Nos. 80518/81185. (SC)21-13423