Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81196
Short Caption:SATICOY BAY LLC SER. 1405 S. NELLIS BLVD. #2121 VS. DITECH FIN. LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A778916Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/18/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
05/18/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-18776
05/18/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-18778
05/26/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael F. Bohn. (SC)
05/27/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC).20-20049
05/28/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-20163
06/11/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request (REJECTED PER 6/12/20 NOTICE). (SC)20-21914
06/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)20-21958
06/15/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)20-22273
06/17/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement . (SC)20-22642
09/25/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief (SC)20-35395
09/25/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 1 (SC)20-35396
09/25/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 2 (SC)20-35397
09/25/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. 3 (SC)20-35398
10/26/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: November 9, 2020. (SC)20-39185
11/09/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-40894
11/16/2020BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Respondent and Affirmance of the District Court's Judgment. (SC).20-41725
12/09/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)20-44856
12/10/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
02/26/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Change of Handling Attorney. Removing Colt B. Dodrill as counsel. (SC)21-05744
05/14/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP21 - RP/LS/AS (SC)21-13967
06/08/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-16335
06/08/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 9, 2021. (SC)21-16335