Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81214
Short Caption:IN RE: A. G.-M.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - JV1900109Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/10/2021 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/10/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/20/2020Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Juvenile Matter. (SC)
05/20/2020Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (SEALED) (SC)
05/21/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SEALED) (SC)
06/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest's Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)20-21458
07/06/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Extend Time (Answer to Writ). (SC)20-24778
07/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real party shall have until August 5, 2020, to file the answer. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)20-25506
08/05/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to File Real Party in Interest's Appendix Under Seal. (SC)20-28811
08/05/2020Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)20-28813
08/07/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service - Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)20-29184
08/10/2020AppendixFiled SEALED Real Party in Interest's Appendix Volumes 1-2 (FILED PER 8/20/20 ORDER). (SC)
08/10/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service - Real Party in Interest's Appendix. (SC)20-29280
08/18/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Due: September 2, 2020. (SC)20-30497
08/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion To File Appendix Under Seal. The clerk of this court shall file the appendix provisionally received on August 10, 2020, under seal. (SC)20-30692
09/02/2020BriefFiled Petition's Reply Brief to State of Nevada, Real Party in Interest, Answer to the Petition for Writ of Prohibition, or in the Alternative Writ of Mandamus. (SC)20-32486
02/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on March 10, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC).21-04348
02/24/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-05398
03/10/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. EC/KP/DH (SC)
05/17/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-14084
06/04/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-16029
06/04/2021Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. (SC)
06/14/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16943
06/28/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-18551
07/13/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC)21-20097
08/09/2021RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing. (SC)21-22988
08/09/2021Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)