Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81218
Short Caption:SHAHROKHI VS. DIST. CT. (BURROW)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78771, 78771-COA, 79336, 79336-COA, 79992, 79992-COA, 80277, 80277-COA, 80447, 80447-COA, 81218-COA, 81791, 81791-COA, 81978, 81978-COA, 82245, 82803, 83164, 83558, 83662, 83682
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D581208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/21/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ali Shahrokhi. Money Order no. 26101120757. (SC)
05/21/2020Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. (Action Necessary by May 29, 2020) (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-19430
05/21/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion Seeking to Disqualify Justice Jerome T. Tao. (SC)20-19431
05/21/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion Seeking an Order to Show Cause and Why Matthew P. Harter, District Judge, Should not be held in Contempt of Court not Following Directives Served on Him in Court of Appeals Writ #79336. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-19432
05/21/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Seal Appendix attached to Original Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-19434
05/28/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency "Motion for Transmittal of Report Involving Minor Child." (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-20212
05/28/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion Seeking to Restore Petitioner's Parental Rights Immediately in Violation of Petitioner's First Amendment Rights and Fourteenth Amendment Rights, Motion Seeking an Order to Return the Minor to State of Nevada Immediately. (SC). (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-20247
05/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response to Motion to Disqualify. Having reviewed the motion to disqualify, it appears that a response from Judge Tao will assist this court in resolving this motion. Therefore, we direct Judge Tao to file an affidavit in response to petitioner's motion to disqualify setting forth his answer to petitioner's allegations of actual or implied bias and clarifying his or his ex-wife's relationship with Standish Law. The affidavit should be filed within 3 days of the date of this order. Real party in interest shall also have 3 days from the date of this order to file any response to the motion to disqualify. (SC)20-20260
05/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit - Declaration of Jerome Tao. (SC)20-20338
05/29/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service - Declaration of Jerome Tao. (SC)20-20386
05/29/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Disqualify. Petitioner has filed a motion seeking to disqualify Judge Tao. Having reviewed the motion to disqualify, we deny it. (SC)20-20404
06/02/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit - Original Declaration of Jerome Tao. (SC)20-20649
06/03/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's "Emergency Motion to Disqualify Based on New Information Increasing the Probability of Bias and/or Risk of Unfair Determination by Judge Jerome Tao." (SC)20-20900
06/03/2020Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Statement of Face-Time Calls Observation." (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-20904
06/03/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter "Affidavit of Jimmy Nguyen." (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-20910
06/04/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's "Motion to Strike District Court "No Contact" Order VOID..." (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-21061
06/04/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Petitioner's "Emergency Motion to Disqualify Mathew Harter, District Court Judge..." (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-21066
06/09/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 2. (SC)20-21640
06/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service (Appendix Volume 2). Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-21644
06/16/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Certificate of Service (Appendix Volume 2). (SC)20-22500
06/24/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Request Penalties for Refusal or Neglect to Obey Writ # COA-79336, Mathew Harter, District Court, Family Judge, Pursuant to NRS 34.290. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 07/13/20 ORDER).20-23369
07/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response to Second Motion to Disqualify. Petitioner has filed a second motion seeking to disqualify Judge Jerome T. Tao of the Nevada Court of Appeals. We direct Judge Tao to file an affidavit. The affidavit should be filed within 3 days of the date of this order. Real party in interest shall also have 3 days from the date of this order to file any response to the motion to disqualify. (SC).20-24387
07/02/2020MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Response to Petitioner's Motion Seeking to Disqualify Justice Jerome T. Tao Pursuant to NRS 1.225(4), NRAP Rule 35. (SC)20-24595
07/08/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Strike Thomas Standish's Response to Petitioner's Motion to Disqualify Judge Jerome Tao. (SC)20-25098
07/08/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Declaration of Ali Shahrokhi in Response to Thomas Standish's Response to Petitioner's Motion to Disqualify Judge Jerome Tao. (SC)20-25106
07/09/2020MotionFiled Declaration of Jerome Tao. (SC)20-25416
07/10/2020MotionFiled Supplemental Response to Petitioner's Motion Seeking to Disqualify Justice Jerome T. Tao Pursuant to NRS 1.225(4). (SC)20-25487
07/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Second Motion to Disqualify. Petitioner has filed a second motion seeking to disqualify Judge Jerome T. Tao of the Nevada Court of Appeals. The second motion to disqualify is denied. Upon filing this order, the clerk of this court shall transfer this case to the court of appeals. NRAP 17(b)(10). fn1 [Petitioner's motion to strike real party in interest's response is denied, as our July 1, 2020, order expressly permitted her to file a response and the filed response pertains to the concerns raised in our order.] (SC).20-25587
07/13/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).20-25591
07/13/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
07/28/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[The Honorable Michael P. Gibbons, Chief Judge, has voluntarily recused himself from participation in this matter.] fn2[The clerk of this court shall file, under seal, the proposed appendix provisionally received in the supreme court on May 21, 2020, and transferred to this court on July 13, 2020.] fn3[In light of this order, petitioner's motions, with the exception of the motion to seal, as denied as moot.] Court of Appeals-JT/BB (SC)
08/24/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC).
08/24/2020RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC).20-31062
08/24/2020Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).