Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81239
Short Caption:BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS. NV EAGLES, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A685203Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/01/2020 / Kuzemka, KristineSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/28/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26001717. (SC)
05/28/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-20218
05/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)20-20220
06/01/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC)20-20471
06/17/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 1, 2020, at 1:00 PM. (SC)20-22646
06/19/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: July 2, 2020. (SC).20-22860
06/30/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Melanie D. Morgan of the law firm of Akerman LLP, as counsel for appellants). (SC)20-24090
07/01/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-24466
07/07/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 23, 2020, at 1:00 PM via Bluejeans Teleconference. (SC)20-24938
07/23/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)20-26975
07/27/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-27152
09/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-33966
09/16/2020Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Additional Transcripts Are Requested. (SC)20-34106
10/16/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)20-38062
10/16/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Opening Brief due: November 25, 2020. (SC)20-38093
11/25/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)20-43151
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix, Volume 1. (SC)20-43153
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix, Volume 2. (SC)20-43154
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix, Volume 3. (SC)20-43156
11/25/2020AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix, Volume 4. (SC)20-43158
12/10/2020MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time To File Answering Brief. (SC)20-44976
12/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date January 27th, 2021. (SC)20-44998
01/27/2021MotionFiled Unopposed Motion To Extend Time To File Answering Brief. (SC)21-02590
02/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 26, 2021. (SC)21-03609
02/26/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)21-05858
03/29/2021BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)21-09011
03/29/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/25/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Lilith V. Xara of the law firm of Akerman LLP as counsel for Appellants Bank of America, N.A., and The Bank of New York Mellon). (SC)21-14935
05/25/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Disassociation (Jamie K. Combs is no longer associated with the law firm of Akerman LLP). (SC)21-14937
06/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating and Remanding. "We vacate the district court's judgement and remand for the district court to consider the tender futility argument in light of Perla Trust." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-17399
06/29/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's petition for rehearing due: July 20, 2021. (SC)21-18665
07/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys from Joseph Y. Hong to John Henry Wright for Respondent's. (SC)21-19961
07/20/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Joseph Y. Hong of Hong & Hong does hereby consent to the substitution of John Henry Writ of The Wright Law Group, P.C., as attorney for Respondent). (SC)21-20900
07/20/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing (REJECTED PER TELEPHONE REQUEST). (SC)
07/20/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 07/20/21). (SC)
07/20/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from John Henry Wright. (SC)
07/20/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-20911
07/21/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-21024
07/21/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from John Henry Wright. (SC)
08/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellants' Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-22338
08/12/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: August 30, 2021. (SC)21-23542
08/30/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Answer to Respondent's Petition for Review (Rehearing). (SC)21-25195
09/17/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-27036