Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0560
Short Caption:IN THE MATTER OF THE AMENDMENT OF RULE 41(E) OF THE NEVADA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURECourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Scheduled for Hearing
Filed Date:06/02/2020Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/02/2020Administrative CaseFiled Petition. (SC)20-20696
06/09/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. (This order is replaced by the corrected order filed on 6/10/20).
06/10/2020Administrative CaseFiled Corrected Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Exhibit A Attached. The Nevada Supreme Court will conduct a public hearing on the petition on June 29, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The hearing will be conducted virtually, and may be viewed on the Supreme Court's website at www.nvcourts.gov/supreme. Persons interested in participating in the hearing may join the meeting at www.bluejeans.com. Click on join meeting; enter meeting ID 674 473 211; participant passcode 4635. For BlueJeans phone dial in, call 1-408-419-1715 or 1-408-915-6290; enter meeting ID 674 473 211; participant passcode 4635. The Court invites written comment from the bench, bar, and public regarding the proposed amendments. Comments may be submitted electronically or in hard-copy format to: Elizabeth A. Brown, Clerk of the Supreme Court, 201 South Carson Street, Carson City, Nevada 89701 or nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov by 5:00 p.m., June 25, 2020. Persons interested in participating in the hearing must notify the Clerk no later than June 25, 2020.20-21789
06/15/2020Administrative CaseFiled Public Comments from James Shapiro. (SC).20-22279
06/22/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Paul Hejmanowski.20-23112
06/24/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Timothy A. Mott.20-23461
06/26/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Peter J. Goatz, Esq.20-23734
06/29/2020Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
07/01/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Inviting Additional Comments. The Court invites additional written comment from the bench, bar, and public pertaining to NRCP 41(e), the COVID-19 stay orders, and the district courts resuming civil trials. Comments may be submitted electronically or in hard-copy format to: Elizabeth A. Brown, Clerk of the Supreme Court, 201 South Carson Street, Carson City, Nevada 89701 or nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. All comments must be submitted by 5:00 p.m., July 14, 2020.20-24293
07/06/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Marcus A. Berg.20-24750
07/06/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from James R. Christensen.20-24766
07/06/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Kenneth L. Hall.20-24789
07/06/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Christopher D. Burk.20-24792
07/06/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from James J. Ream.20-24793
07/07/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Ivy Gage and David O. Creasy.20-24990
07/07/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Rodolfo Gonzalez.20-24993
07/08/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Christian M. Morris. EMAIL.20-25075
07/08/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from James R. Christensen.20-25151
07/08/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Paul Hejmanowski.20-25230
07/10/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robert E. Murdock. EMAIL.20-25488
07/13/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments/ from Christian M. Morris. ORIGINAL.20-25659
07/13/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robert E. Murdock. Response to Mr. Hejmanowski's Supplement Comments filed on July 8, 2020. EMAIL.20-25661
07/14/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Marjorie Hauf.20-25806
07/14/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robert E. Murdock. ORIGINAL.20-25844
07/14/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Calder B. Gabroy. EMAIL.20-25845
07/16/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Robert E. Murdock. Response to Mr. Hejmanowski's Supplement Comments filed on July 8, 2020. ORIGINAL.20-26223
07/21/2020Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Calder B. Gabroy. ORIGINAL.20-26635