Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81264
Short Caption:SATICOY BAY LLC SER. 10007 LIBERTY VIEW VS. S. TERRACE HOACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A798839Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/16/2020 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/02/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/02/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-20758
06/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-20760
06/12/2020Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau. (SC)
06/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-21952
06/12/2020Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 22807 returned to Roger P. Croteau & Associates. (SC)
06/16/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (SC)20-22376
06/26/2020Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-23746
07/14/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for: TBD. (SC)20-25893
08/26/2020Settlement Program ReportFiled Amended ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)20-31518
08/28/2020Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)20-31761
09/01/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/21/19 and 3/12/20 To Court Reporter: Nancy Maldonado . (SC)20-32253
09/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Disassociation for Chet A Glover. (SC)20-32739
11/23/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 14, 2020. (SC)20-42696
12/01/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from Court Reporter regarding payment for transcripts that have been requested. As of today there has been no payment received. (SC)20-43445
12/14/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-45247
12/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 1 (SC)20-45248
12/14/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 2 (SC)20-45249
01/12/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Southern Terrace Homeowners Association's answering brief due: January 27, 2021. (SC)21-01005
01/13/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent United Legal Services, Inc.'s answering brief due: January 27, 2021. (SC)21-01060
01/25/2021BriefFiled Respondent United Legal Services, Inc. Answering Brief. (SC)21-02325
01/26/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Southern Terrace Homeowners' Association's Answering Brief. (SC)21-02426
02/22/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: March 11, 2021. (SC)21-05135
03/11/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-07065
03/11/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/16/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-11082
05/11/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-13434
05/11/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/07/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 12, 2021. (SC)21-13434