Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81270
Short Caption:MEDINA (ERICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C342076Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/03/2020Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
06/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)20-20890
06/10/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC)20-21724
06/23/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)20-23350
10/01/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (SC)20-36164
10/02/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved to file Opening Brief and Appendix due date November 2nd, 2020 (SC)20-36268
11/02/2020MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-39895
11/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 16, 2020. (SC).20-41061
11/16/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).20-41765
11/16/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Select Trial Exhibits. (SC).20-41766
11/16/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1-5. (SC).20-41771
12/03/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for the transmission of original exhibits. The motion is denied without prejudice. (SC)20-43774
12/16/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Karen Mishler. (SC)20-45499
12/16/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-45500
12/16/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)20-45503
01/15/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)21-01544
01/21/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date January 29, 2021. (SC)21-01706
01/29/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-02935
01/29/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Supplemental Appendix. (SC)21-02938
02/01/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the supplemental appendix. (SC)21-14163
05/24/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Supplemental Appendix Under Seal. (SC)21-14784
06/04/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the supplemental appendix received on May 26, 2021. (SC)21-16085
06/04/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's (SEALED) Supplemental Appendix. (SC)
06/11/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-16906
07/06/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-19192
07/06/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
07/23/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 7, 2021. (SC)21-19192