Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 81281
Short Caption:MORENCY VS. STATE, DEP'T OF EDUCATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A800267Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:03/01/2021 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/01/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/08/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/08/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-21364
06/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-21369
06/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-21373
06/11/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellants' Case Appeal Statement. (SC).20-21873
06/15/2020Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC).20-22290
06/15/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Institute for Justice. Check no. 000617. (SC)
06/15/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)20-22320
06/17/2020Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)20-22576
06/29/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellants' Transcript Request Form (REJECTED PER 06/29/20 NOTICE). (SC).
06/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC).20-23944
06/29/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/23/20. To Court Reporter: Kaihla Berndt. (SC)20-24078
07/10/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)20-25543
07/10/2020AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volumes I-IV. (SC)20-25547
08/03/2020MotionFiled Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Briefs. (SC)20-28240
08/04/2020MotionFiled Appellants' Opposition to Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Briefs. (SC)20-28403
08/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents shall have until September 24, 2020, to file and serve the answering briefs. (SC)20-28408
08/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents' joint motion for extensions of time to file the answering briefs was granted by this court on August 4, 2020. See NRAP 27(c)(2). On the same date, appellants filed an opposition to the motion, which this court construes as a motion for reconsideration of its order granting an extension of time. The motion for reconsideration is denied. (SC)20-29927
09/24/2020BriefFiled Respondent State of Nevada's Answering Brief. (SC)20-35302
09/24/2020BriefFiled Respondent Nevada Legislature's Answering Brief with Addendum. (SC)20-35309
09/25/2020BriefFiled Amended Respondent Nevada Legislature's Answering Brief with Addendum. (SC)20-35311
10/26/2020BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)20-39179
10/26/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Mailing Address (Timothy D. Keller). (SC)20-46083
01/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on March 1, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-01792
02/16/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Unopposed Motion to Associate Counsel, Robert Gall. (SC)21-04391
02/16/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants have filed a motion to associate attorney Robert Gall of the Institute for Justice pursuant to SCR 42. The motion is granted. Mr. Gall shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellants. Nevada attorney Joshua A. House of the Institute for Justice shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Gall in this matter. (SC).21-04453
02/16/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-04480
03/01/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. 81281. (SC)
05/14/2021BriefFiled Appellants' Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)21-14024
05/18/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Nevada Legislature's Response to Appellants' Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)21-14349
05/19/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Response to Supplemental Authority. (SC)21-14370
08/16/2021MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw Counsel Who Has Left Firm (Timothy D. Keller). (SC)21-23830
08/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellants is granted. The clerk of this court shall remove attorney Timothy D. Keller as counsel of record for appellants. Appellants shall continue to be represented by attorneys Joshua A. House and Matthew T. Dushoff. (SC)21-24473